Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/27/2021 at 10:03:22 (UTC).

Krmpotich v. Verizon Wireless (VAW), LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 Krmpotich filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Verizon Wireless VAW , LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nancy E. Brasel and Katherine M. Menendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-00189

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy E. Brasel

Referral Judge

Katherine M. Menendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Krmpotich

Defendants

Verizon Wireless (VAW) LLC

City & County Credit Union

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Verizon Wireless (VAW), LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jenna Dakroub

Attorney at Price Law Group, APC

8245 N. 85Th Way

Scottsdale, AZ 85258

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher R Morris

Attorney at Bassford Remele

100 South 5Th Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Lauren Hoglund

Attorney at Messerli & Kramer P.A.

100 South Fifth Street, Suite 1400

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Terrance J Wagener

Attorney at Messerli & Kramer P.A.

1400 South Fifth Street, 100 South Fifth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

James P Joseph, II

Attorney at Jones Day

150 W. Jefferson, Suite 2100

Detroit, MI 48226

Gregory John Myers

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP

100 Washington Ave S Ste 2200

Mpls, MN 55401-2179

 

Court Documents

#39

(#39) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #20 MOTION to Strike Pleading #11 Answer to Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (Dakroub, Jenna) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

38 #1

Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel

#38

(#38) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dawn M. McCraw. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8634284 filed by David Krmpotich. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Dakroub, Jenna) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#37

(#37) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Krmpotich (Dakroub, Jenna) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#36

(#36) Letter re: withdrawal of motion re #34 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendant Verizon Wireless (VAW), LLC only, With Prejudice, #35 Proposed Order to Judge. (Dakroub, Jenna) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#35

(#35) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #34 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendant Verizon Wireless (VAW), LLC only, With Prejudice filed by David Krmpotich.(Dakroub, Jenna) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#34

(#34) MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendant Verizon Wireless (VAW), LLC only, With Prejudice filed by David Krmpotich. (Dakroub, Jenna) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#20

(#32) RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Strike Pleading #11 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Myers, Gregory) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#11

(#32) RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Strike Pleading #11 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Myers, Gregory) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint filed by City & County Credit Union. (Morris, Christopher) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Krmpotich. Verizon Wireless (VAW), LLC served on 2/4/2021, answer due 2/25/2021. (Dakroub, Jenna) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Krmpotich. City & County Credit Union served on 1/29/2021, answer due 2/19/2021. (Dakroub, Jenna) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Krmpotich. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 1/28/2021, answer due 2/18/2021. (Dakroub, Jenna) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to City & County Credit Union, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Verizon Wireless (VAW), LLC. (MMG) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#3

(#9) ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint filed by City & County Credit Union. (Morris, Christopher) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna Dakroub on behalf of David Krmpotich. (Dakroub, Jenna) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against City & County Credit Union, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Verizon Wireless (VAW) LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8435314) filed by David Krmpotich. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dakroub, Jenna) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #20 MOTION to Strike Pleading #11 Answer to Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (Dakroub, Jenna) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dawn M. McCraw. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8634284 filed by David Krmpotich. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Dakroub, Jenna) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Krmpotich (Dakroub, Jenna) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Letter re: withdrawal of motion re #34 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendant Verizon Wireless (VAW), LLC only, With Prejudice, #35 Proposed Order to Judge. (Dakroub, Jenna) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #34 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendant Verizon Wireless (VAW), LLC only, With Prejudice filed by David Krmpotich.(Dakroub, Jenna) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendant Verizon Wireless (VAW), LLC only, With Prejudice filed by David Krmpotich. (Dakroub, Jenna) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) DECLARATION of Gregory J. Myers in Opposition to #20 MOTION to Strike Pleading #11 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Myers, Gregory) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Strike Pleading #11 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Myers, Gregory) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Verizon Wireless (VAW), LLC only by David Krmpotich (Dakroub, Jenna) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) (Text Only) ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 4/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 3/16/2021. (KAT) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant City & County Credit Union. (Morris, Christopher) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint filed by City & County Credit Union. (Morris, Christopher) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Krmpotich. Verizon Wireless (VAW), LLC served on 2/4/2021, answer due 2/25/2021. (Dakroub, Jenna) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Krmpotich. City & County Credit Union served on 1/29/2021, answer due 2/19/2021. (Dakroub, Jenna) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Krmpotich. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 1/28/2021, answer due 2/18/2021. (Dakroub, Jenna) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to City & County Credit Union, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Verizon Wireless (VAW), LLC. (MMG) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-189 NEB/KMM. (MMG) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against City & County Credit Union, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Verizon Wireless (VAW) LLC. filed by David Krmpotich. Filer requests summons issued. (Dakroub, Jenna) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna Dakroub on behalf of David Krmpotich. (Dakroub, Jenna) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against City & County Credit Union, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Verizon Wireless (VAW) LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8435314) filed by David Krmpotich. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dakroub, Jenna) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VERIZON WIRELESS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where City County Credit Union of Fort Lauderdale is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant