This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 09:06:50 (UTC).

Krispy Krunchy Foods LLC v. Silco LLC

Case Summary

On 02/21/2020 Krispy Krunchy Foods LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Silco LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Pamela Pepper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00293

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela Pepper

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC

Krispy Krunchy Foods LLC

Krispy Krunchy Foods LLC doing business as Krispy Krunchy Chicken

Defendant

Silco LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael R Laing

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

33 E Main St - Ste 201

Madison, WI 53703

Thomas L Holt

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

131 S Dearborn St - Ste 1700

Chicago, IL 60603-5559

Jeremy L Buxbaum

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

131 S Dearborn St - Ste 1700

Chicago, IL 60603-5559

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

8 #1

Exhibit to Declaration

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketClerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Silco LLC. (amb) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DECLARATION of Michael R. Laing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Declaration)(Laing, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST for Entry of Default by Krispy Krunchy Foods LLC. (Laing, Michael) Modified on 3/25/2020 (amb).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Krispy Krunchy Foods LLC. Silco LLC served on 2/25/2020. (Laing, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Silco LLC. (amb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Laing, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R Laing on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Michael R. Laing (Laing, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (Laing, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Laing, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3371086) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Laing, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/21/2020: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (amb).

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Silco LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael R Laing

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas L Holt