This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 09:44:33 (UTC).

KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC v. VAD INVESTMENT INC

Case Summary

On 03/11/2020 KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against VAD INVESTMENT INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT L HINKLE and MICHAEL J FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00139

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT L HINKLE

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS, LLC d/b/a KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN

KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC

KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC doing business as KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN

Defendants

VAD INVESTMENT INC.

VAD INVESTMENT INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELIZABETH M BANZHOFF

Attorney at PERKINS COIE LLP - DENVER CO

1900 16Th Street, Suite 1400

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) AO 120 Patent and Trademark New Case Notification. Copy sent electronically to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cle) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Gautham Patel on March 12, 2020, filed by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC. (BANZHOFF, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to VAD INVESTMENT INC. (cle) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH M BANZHOFF on behalf of KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS, LLC d/b/a KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN (BANZHOFF, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS, LLC d/b/a KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN identifying Corporate Parent KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS, LLC d/b/a KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN for KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS, LLC d/b/a KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN.. (BANZHOFF, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BANZHOFF, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

1 #2

Summons for VAD INVESTMENT INC.

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against VAD INVESTMENT INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4949454.), filed by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS, LLC d/b/a KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons for VAD INVESTMENT INC.) (BANZHOFF, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AO 120 Patent and Trademark New Case Notification. Copy sent electronically to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cle) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Gautham Patel on March 12, 2020, filed by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC. (BANZHOFF, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to VAD INVESTMENT INC. (cle) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH M BANZHOFF on behalf of KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS, LLC d/b/a KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN (BANZHOFF, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS, LLC d/b/a KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN identifying Corporate Parent KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS, LLC d/b/a KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN for KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS, LLC d/b/a KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN.. (BANZHOFF, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BANZHOFF, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against VAD INVESTMENT INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4949454.), filed by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS, LLC d/b/a KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons for VAD INVESTMENT INC.) (BANZHOFF, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth M. Banzhoff