This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/15/2020 at 09:39:03 (UTC).

KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS, LLC d/b/a KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN v. JAY GANESH FOOD MART, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2020 KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS, LLC d/b/a KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against JAY GANESH FOOD MART, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is HUGH LAWSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-00046

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HUGH LAWSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC

KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN

Defendants

NEEL FOOD MART INC

JAY GANESH FOOD MART LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THOMAS L HOLT

131 South Dearborn St, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60603

JEREMY L BUXBAUM

131 South Dearborn St, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60603

CHRISTIAN R RUIZ

2901 N Central Ave Ste 2000

Phoenix, AZ 85012

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Plaintiff to file its motion for default judgment is extended through June 11, 2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON on 5/12/2020. (aks) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#19

(#19) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Default Judgment. by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC filed by CHRISTIAN R RUIZ.(RUIZ, CHRISTIAN) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#18

(#18) Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by THOMAS L HOLT. Docketed separately due to error in combined entry. (nop) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

17 #1

PHV Admission

#17

(#17) Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by THOMAS L HOLT, JEREMY L BUXBAUM (Attachments: #1 PHV Admission) (nop) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

16 #1

Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Christian Ruiz ISO Motion for Entry of Default Again

#16

(#16) AFFIDAVIT re #15 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendants by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Christian Ruiz ISO Motion for Entry of Default Against Defendants)(RUIZ, CHRISTIAN) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#15

(#15) MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendants by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC filed by CHRISTIAN R RUIZ.(RUIZ, CHRISTIAN) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC as to JAY GANESH FOOD MART LLC. (RUIZ, CHRISTIAN) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to JAY GANESH FOOD MART LLC. (rlw) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by CHRISTIAN R RUIZ on behalf of KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS, LLC d/b/a KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN (RUIZ, CHRISTIAN) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS, LLC d/b/a KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN (RUIZ, CHRISTIAN) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS, LLC d/b/a KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN re #1 Complaint, (RUIZ, CHRISTIAN) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

1 #4

Summons Neel Food Mart, Inc.

1 #3

Summons Jay Ganesh Food Mart, LLC

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Certificates of Registration

#1

Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC ); Documents must include a description of exhibit(s). A generic identifier such as Exhibit A or Exhibit 1 is not acceptable. The description must be of sufficient detail to make the attachment readily identifiable to the court. No need to refile; docket entry has been corrected by case administrator. (rlw) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Plaintiff to file its motion for default judgment is extended through June 11, 2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON on 5/12/2020. (aks) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Default Judgment. by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC filed by CHRISTIAN R RUIZ.(RUIZ, CHRISTIAN) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by THOMAS L HOLT. Docketed separately due to error in combined entry. (nop) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by THOMAS L HOLT, JEREMY L BUXBAUM (Attachments: #1 PHV Admission) (nop) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketCLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to JAY GANESH FOOD MART LLC, NEEL FOOD MART INC - Plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment within 21 days. The motion for default judgment shall state whether a hearing is necessary to determine damages, and if a hearing is not necessary, the motion shall include all evidence supporting the damages sought in the motion and a proposed order granting the motion. Failure to comply with this notice may result in this action being dismissed for failure to prosecute. (rlw) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #15 Motion for Entry of Default filed by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC ); Wrong event used - No need to refile - correct event is Application to Clerk for Entry of Default. (rlw) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AFFIDAVIT re #15 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendants by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Christian Ruiz ISO Motion for Entry of Default Against Defendants)(RUIZ, CHRISTIAN) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendants by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC filed by CHRISTIAN R RUIZ.(RUIZ, CHRISTIAN) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC as to JAY GANESH FOOD MART LLC. (RUIZ, CHRISTIAN) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC as to JAY GANESH FOOD MART LLC. (RUIZ, CHRISTIAN) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to NEEL FOOD MART INC. (rlw) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to JAY GANESH FOOD MART LLC. (rlw) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL THOMAS L HOLT, JEREMY L BUXBAUM - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (rlw) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC ); Documents must include a description of exhibit(s). A generic identifier such as Exhibit A or Exhibit 1 is not acceptable. The description must be of sufficient detail to make the attachment readily identifiable to the court. No need to refile; docket entry has been corrected by case administrator. (rlw) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketCase REASSIGNED to US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON. US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER no longer assigned to the case. (rlw) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketThis is a text only entry; no document issued.CASE TRANSFERRED TO Valdosta Pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 Statement. (bcl) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by CHRISTIAN R RUIZ on behalf of KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS, LLC d/b/a KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN (RUIZ, CHRISTIAN) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS, LLC d/b/a KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN (RUIZ, CHRISTIAN) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS, LLC d/b/a KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN re #1 Complaint, (RUIZ, CHRISTIAN) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3418628, $400 filed by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS, LLC d/b/a KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Registration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Jay Ganesh Food Mart, LLC, #4 Summons Neel Food Mart, Inc.)(RUIZ, CHRISTIAN) Modified text on 3/17/2020 (rlw). (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTIAN R RUIZ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeremy L. Buxbaum