This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/06/2019 at 07:54:36 (UTC).

Kriby et al v. Kenney, et al

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 Kriby filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Kenney. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr and John W. deGravelles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00080

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Eric Kriby

Carissa Kriby

Deborah Kriby

Defendants

Smith Sawmill Service, LLC

Travelers Indemnity Company of America

Austin Kenney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Keanan J. Parr

Attorney at Fisher Injury Lawyers

6715 Perkins Road

Baton Rouge, LA 70808

Christopher James Day

Attorney at Fisher Injury Lawyers

6715 Perkins Rd

Baton Rouge, LA 70808

Bryan D. Fisher

Attorney at Fisher Injury Lawyers

6715 Perkins Road

Baton Rouge, LA 70808

Defendant Attorney

Janice Reeves

Attorney at Maricle & Associates

8545 United Plaza Blvd., Suite 350

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit State Court Petition

1 #3

Attachment List of Counsel

1 #4

Affidavit Affidavit of Service

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#12

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Minute Entry/Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 4/2/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 5/15/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 5/15/2019. Discovery due by 11/29/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 12/30/2019. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 1/31/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 2/28/2020. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 4/30/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 5/29/2020. Motions shall be filed by 6/30/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/20/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 11/5/2020 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge John W. deGravelles. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 11/25/2020. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 12/11/2020. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 12/28/2020. Jury Trial set for 1/11/2021 - 1/15/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge John W. deGravelles. (JSL) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • (#11) Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 4/2/2019 is CONVERTED to a Telephone Conference set for 4/2/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Counsel for the defendants shall initiate the call to all parties and contact chambers at 225-389-3602.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(SGO) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Austin Kenney, Smith Sawmill Service, LLC.(Reeves, Janice) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Joint STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Day, Christopher) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Austin Kenney, Smith Sawmill Service, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Submitted (Day, Christopher) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Partial Dismissal dismissing Plaintiffs, Eric Kriby and Deborah Kriby claims against Defendants, Austin Kenney, Smith Sawmill, LLC, and Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut. Plaintiff Carissa Kirby reserves all rights in regards to her claim(s) against all Defendants. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 3/8/2019. (SWE) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Partial Dismissal by Eric Kriby and Deborah Kriby. (Day, Christopher) Modified on 3/8/2019 to edit the text (SWE). (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/2/2019 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 3/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 2/19/2019. (JSL) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Travelers Indemnity Company of America.(Reeves, Janice) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Indemnity Company of America identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for Travelers Indemnity Company of America.. (Reeves, Janice) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number 677444. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1896144), filed by Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Petition, #3 Attachment List of Counsel, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Reeves, Janice) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Travelers Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher James Day

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bryan D. Fisher