This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/18/2022 at 06:11:40 (UTC).

Kreuz v. Carolina Finance, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2021 Kreuz filed an Other lawsuit against Carolina Finance, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard E. Myers, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00497

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard E. Myers, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Stephen Kreuz

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Carolina Finance, LLC

NC Recovery Services, Inc.

Manheim Remarketing, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Craig M. Shapiro

Attorney at Law Offices of John T. Orcutt, P.C.

1738 Hillandale Road, Suite D

Durham, NC 27705

Jeremy Stuart Harn

Attorney at Law Offices of John T. Orcutt, PC

6616 Six Forks Rd, Suite 203

Raleigh, NC 27615

Koury L. Hicks

Attorney at Law Offices of John T. Orcutt, P.C.

1738 Hillandale Road, Suite D

Durham, NC 27705

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Clinton Shepperd Morse

Attorney at Brooks Pierce McLendon Humphrey & Leonard, L.L.P.

P.O. Box 26000 (Zip 27420)

Allison J. Becker

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

421 Fayetteville St., Ste 330

Raleigh, NC 27601

Kendra N. Stark

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

421 Fayetteville St., Ste 330

Raleigh, NC 27601

Eric G. Sauls

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

4101 Lake Boone Trail, Suite 514

Raleigh, NC 27607

Jamie E. Rudd

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

4101 Lake Boone Trail, Suite 514

Raleigh, NC 27607

 

Court Documents

#43

(#43) ORDER Appointing Jacqueline R. Clare as Mediator. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/10/2022. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#42

(#42) Selection of Jacqueline R. Clare as mediator filed by Stephen Kreuz. (Shapiro, Craig) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#41

(#41) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2023 at time TBA in Wilmington - Courtroom TBA before Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II. Discovery due by 11/4/2022. Motions due by 12/23/2022. Jury Trial set for 4/25/2023 at time TBA AM in Wilmington - Courtroom TBA before Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 4/21/2022. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#40

(#40) REPLY regarding #30 Motion to Dismiss filed by Manheim Remarketing, Inc.. (Rudd, Jamie) Modified on 4/25/2022 to correct docket text and create docket entry relationship with corresponding motion (Waddell, K.). (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#39

(#39) Memorandum in Opposition regarding #30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Stephen Kreuz. (Shapiro, Craig) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#38

(#38) ANSWER to #34 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Stephen Kreuz. (Shapiro, Craig) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#34

(#38) ANSWER to #34 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Stephen Kreuz. (Shapiro, Craig) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#30

Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Unopposed). (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#22

Motions Submitted to Chief US District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and #30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Koury L. Hicks on behalf of Stephen Kreuz. (Hicks, Koury) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Carolina Finance, LLC, Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NC Recovery Services, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#3

(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by Stephen Kreuz (Shapiro, Craig) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Craig M. Shapiro on behalf of Stephen Kreuz. (Shapiro, Craig) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Carolina Finance, LLC, Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NC Recovery Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6343328.), filed by Stephen Kreuz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Shapiro, Craig) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ORDER Appointing Jacqueline R. Clare as Mediator. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/10/2022. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Selection of Jacqueline R. Clare as mediator filed by Stephen Kreuz. (Shapiro, Craig) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Submitted to Chief US District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and #30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL - Pursuant to Local ADR Rule 101.1c(a), counsel is reminded that the parties must file a written statement identifying an agreed upon mediator within twenty one (21) days of the entry of the Scheduling Order. If a statement is not timely filed, the Clerk of Court will appoint a mediator from the list of court certified mediators. Selection of Mediator must be electronically filed on or before 5/12/2022. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2023 at time TBA in Wilmington - Courtroom TBA before Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II. Discovery due by 11/4/2022. Motions due by 12/23/2022. Jury Trial set for 4/25/2023 at time TBA AM in Wilmington - Courtroom TBA before Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 4/21/2022. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) REPLY regarding #30 Motion to Dismiss filed by Manheim Remarketing, Inc.. (Rudd, Jamie) Modified on 4/25/2022 to correct docket text and create docket entry relationship with corresponding motion (Waddell, K.). (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Memorandum in Opposition regarding #30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Stephen Kreuz. (Shapiro, Craig) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ANSWER to #34 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Stephen Kreuz. (Shapiro, Craig) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #36 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Plaintiff has up to and including April 7, 2022, within which to respond to the Motion to Dismiss #30 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/18/2022. (Hockaday, A.) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Unopposed). (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen Kreuz. Manheim Remarketing, Inc. served on 12/9/2021, answer due 12/30/2021. (Shapiro, Craig) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen Kreuz. Carolina Finance, LLC served on 12/9/2021, answer due 12/30/2021. (Shapiro, Craig) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Jeremy Stuart Harn on behalf of Stephen Kreuz. (Harn, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Koury L. Hicks on behalf of Stephen Kreuz. (Hicks, Koury) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCase Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Carolina Finance, LLC, Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NC Recovery Services, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by Stephen Kreuz (Shapiro, Craig) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Craig M. Shapiro on behalf of Stephen Kreuz. (Shapiro, Craig) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Carolina Finance, LLC, Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NC Recovery Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6343328.), filed by Stephen Kreuz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Shapiro, Craig) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MANHEIM REMARKETING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clinton Shepperd Morse