This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/18/2021 at 10:04:22 (UTC).

Kremer v. GP Strategies Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 Kremer filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against GP Strategies Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul A. Crotty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06985

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Crotty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hugh Kremer

Defendants

GP Strategies Corporation

Scott N. Greenberg

Adam H. Stedham

Samuel D. Robinson

Tamar Elkeles

Marshall S. Geller

Steven E. Koonin

Jacques Manardo

Richard C. Pfenniger, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Evan J. Smith

Attorney at Brodsky & Smith, L.L.C.

240 Mineola Blvd.

Mineola, NY 11501

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Tamar Elkeles waiver sent on 8/27/2021, answer due 10/26/2021; GP Strategies Corporation waiver sent on 8/27/2021, answer due 10/26/2021; Marshall S. Geller waiver sent on 8/27/2021, answer due 10/26/2021; Scott N. Greenberg waiver sent on 8/27/2021, answer due 10/26/2021; Steven E. Koonin waiver sent on 8/27/2021, answer due 10/26/2021; Jacques Manardo waiver sent on 8/27/2021, answer due 10/26/2021; Richard C. Pfenniger, Jr waiver sent on 8/27/2021, answer due 10/26/2021; Samuel D. Robinson waiver sent on 8/27/2021, answer due 10/26/2021; Adam H. Stedham waiver sent on 8/27/2021, answer due 10/26/2021. Document filed by Hugh Kremer..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tamar Elkeles, GP Strategies Corporation, Marshall S. Geller, Scott N. Greenberg, Steven E. Koonin, Jacques Manardo, Richard C. Pfenniger, Jr, Samuel D. Robinson, Adam H. Stedham. (sj) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GP STRATEGIES CORPORATION, SCOTT N. GREENBERG, ADAM H. STEDHAM, SAMUEL D. ROBINSON, TAMAR ELKELES, MARSHALL S. GELLER, STEVEN E. KOONIN, JACQUES MANARDO, and RICHARD C. PFENNIGER, JR., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Hugh Kremer..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Hugh Kremer..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Tamar Elkeles, GP Strategies Corporation, Marshall S. Geller, Scott N. Greenberg, Steven E. Koonin, Jacques Manardo, Richard C. Pfenniger, Jr, Samuel D. Robinson, Adam H. Stedham. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24955027)Document filed by Hugh Kremer..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GP STRATEGIES CORPORATION DBA GP SANDY A SUBDIVIDION OF GP STRATEGIES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Evan Jason Smith