This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2019 at 10:03:16 (UTC).

Krehbeil et al v. HD2, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 Krehbeil filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against HD2, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael H. Simon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00530

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael H. Simon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COETY HAILI

CORY KREHBIEL

GLEN VANDERYACHT

Robert Glass

Defendant

HD2, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jon H. Weiner

Attorney at Jon H. Weiner, Attorney at Law

1415 Commercial St Se

Salem, OR 97302

Sharia Mayfield

Attorney at Law Office of Jon Weiner

1415 Commercial St. Se

Salem, OR 97302

Defendant Attorneys

Jeremy G. Tolchin

Attorney at Motschenbacher & Blattner LLP

117 Sw Taylor St, Suite 300

Portland, OR 97204

Alex C. Trauman

Attorney at Motschenbacher & Blattner LLP

117 Sw Taylor Street, Suite 300

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Response to Objections to Findings & Recommendation. Related document(s): #10 Answer to Complaint. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mayfield, Sharia) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#10

(#10) Answer to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses. Filed by HD2, LLC. (Trauman, Alex) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#8

(#8) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by HD2, LLC. (Trauman, Alex) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#7

(#7) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #6 upon All Defendants Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weiner, Jon) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued Electronically as to HD2, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#5

(#5) Amended Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weiner, Jon) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#4

(#4) Amended Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weiner, Jon) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 8/9/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/9/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 9/9/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weiner, Jon) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5807428 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by COETY HAILI, GLEN VANDERYACHT, CORY KREHBIEL, Robert Glass against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Weiner, Jon) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Response to Objections to Findings & Recommendation. Related document(s): #10 Answer to Complaint. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mayfield, Sharia) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Answer to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses. Filed by HD2, LLC. (Trauman, Alex) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER - Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF #8 ) is GRANTED. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 6/4/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by HD2, LLC. (Trauman, Alex) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #6 upon All Defendants Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weiner, Jon) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued Electronically as to HD2, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Amended Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weiner, Jon) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Amended Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weiner, Jon) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 8/9/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/9/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 9/9/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weiner, Jon) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5807428 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by COETY HAILI, GLEN VANDERYACHT, CORY KREHBIEL, Robert Glass against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Weiner, Jon) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sharia Mayfield

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jon H. Weiner