This case was last updated from PACER on 03/15/2019 at 07:29:49 (UTC).

Kreer v. Taylor et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2019 Kreer filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Taylor. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert E. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00038

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert E. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emily Kreer

Defendants

Adrian S. Taylor

CT Transportation, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Emmet Dwayne Alexander

Attorney at Alexander Law Group PLC

6601 Irongate Square, Suite A

Richmond, VA 23234

Michael Robert Krol

Attorney at Alexander Law Group PLC

6601 Irongate Square, Suite A

Richmond, VA 23234

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Patrick Frankl

Attorney at Frankl Miller Webb & Moyers LLP

1711 Grandin Rd, Po Box 4126

Roanoke, VA 24015

Kevin Michael Gick

Attorney at Frankl Miller Webb & Moyers LLP

1711 Grandin Rd, Po Box 4126

Roanoke, VA 24015

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Schedule A

#18

(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER. See for complete details. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of District Judge Robert E. Payne on 03/07/2019. (Attachment: #1 Schedule A) (nbrow) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#17

(#17) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/20/2019 at 11:30 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before District Judge Robert E. Payne. See for complete details. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of District Judge Robert E. Payne on 03/07/2019. (nbrow) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#16

(#16) ORDER that ADRIAN S. TAYLOR'S AND CT TRANSPORTATION, LLC'S 73 MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE is denied. It is further ORDERED that the facts and legal contentions are adequately presented in the materials before the Court and oral argument would not aid the decisional process. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 3/6/2019. (jsmi, ) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

#15

(#15) ORDER that ADRIAN S. TAYLOR'S AND CT TRANSPORTATION, LLC'S #8 MOTION TO BIFURCATE is denied. It is further ORDERED that the facts and legal contentions are adequately presented in the materials before the Court and oral argument would not aid the decisional process. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 3/5/2019. (jsmi, ) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#14

(#14) REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Bifurcate filed by Adrian S. Taylor. (Frankl, Daniel) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#13

(#13) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Adrian S. Taylor. (Frankl, Daniel) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#12

(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Emily Kreer. (Krol, Michael) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Bifurcate filed by Emily Kreer. (Krol, Michael) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

#10

(#10) Discovery Plan by CT Transportation, LLC.(Frankl, Daniel) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

#9

(#9) Rule 26 Disclosure by Emily Kreer. (Krol, Michael) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Bifurcate by Adrian S. Taylor. (Frankl, Daniel) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Adrian S. Taylor. (Frankl, Daniel) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER that the Demurrer filed in the state court (EOF No. 1-1 (DEMURRER AND ANSWER OF ADRIAN S. TAYLOR AND CT TRANSPORTATION, LLC)) is denied without prejudice to the filing of a motion on the same topic pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) with accompanying briefs. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/22/2019. (jsmi, ) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Robert Krol on behalf of Emily Kreer (Krol, Michael) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Robert Krol on behalf of Emily Kreer (Krol, Michael) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER that the Motion for Consolidation and a separate Motion for Bifurcation shall be filed and briefed on the following schedule: motions filed separately by the defendants on January 25, 2019; plaintiffs' responses to each motion shall be filed on February 11, 2019; and defendants' shall file their replies in support of the motions. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/16/2019. (jsmi, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#2

(#2) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by CT Transportation, LLC. (Frankl, Daniel) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) SCHEDULING ORDER. See for complete details. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of District Judge Robert E. Payne on 03/07/2019. (Attachment: #1 Schedule A) (nbrow) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/20/2019 at 11:30 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before District Judge Robert E. Payne. See for complete details. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of District Judge Robert E. Payne on 03/07/2019. (nbrow) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER that ADRIAN S. TAYLOR'S AND CT TRANSPORTATION, LLC'S 73 MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE is denied. It is further ORDERED that the facts and legal contentions are adequately presented in the materials before the Court and oral argument would not aid the decisional process. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 3/6/2019. (jsmi, ) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER that ADRIAN S. TAYLOR'S AND CT TRANSPORTATION, LLC'S #8 MOTION TO BIFURCATE is denied. It is further ORDERED that the facts and legal contentions are adequately presented in the materials before the Court and oral argument would not aid the decisional process. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 3/5/2019. (jsmi, ) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Bifurcate filed by Adrian S. Taylor. (Frankl, Daniel) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Adrian S. Taylor. (Frankl, Daniel) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Emily Kreer. (Krol, Michael) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Bifurcate filed by Emily Kreer. (Krol, Michael) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Discovery Plan by CT Transportation, LLC.(Frankl, Daniel) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Rule 26 Disclosure by Emily Kreer. (Krol, Michael) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Bifurcate by Adrian S. Taylor. (Frankl, Daniel) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Adrian S. Taylor. (Frankl, Daniel) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER that the Demurrer filed in the state court (EOF No. 1-1 (DEMURRER AND ANSWER OF ADRIAN S. TAYLOR AND CT TRANSPORTATION, LLC)) is denied without prejudice to the filing of a motion on the same topic pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) with accompanying briefs. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/22/2019. (jsmi, ) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Robert Krol on behalf of Emily Kreer (Krol, Michael) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Robert Krol on behalf of Emily Kreer (Krol, Michael) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER that the Motion for Consolidation and a separate Motion for Bifurcation shall be filed and briefed on the following schedule: motions filed separately by the defendants on January 25, 2019; plaintiffs' responses to each motion shall be filed on February 11, 2019; and defendants' shall file their replies in support of the motions. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/16/2019. (jsmi, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by CT Transportation, LLC. (Frankl, Daniel) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Case assigned to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (jsmi, ) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6445007.), filed by Adrian S. Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Frankl, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsmi, ). (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CT Transportation LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Robert Krol(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emmet Dwayne Alexander(Designation Retained)