This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/08/2021 at 07:39:23 (UTC).

Andrew Kraynler v. BMW of North America, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 Andrew Kraynler filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW of North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha and Karen L. Stevenson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-10271

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrew Kraynler

Defendants

BMW of North America, LLC

DOES 1 through 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam Morris Rose

Attorney at Law Offices of Robert Starr APC

23901 Calabasas Road Suite 2072

Calabasas, CA 91302

Theodore Richard Tang

Attorney at Law Offices of Robert Starr

23901 Calabasas Road Suite 2072

Calabasas, CA 91302

Robert L Starr

Attorney at Law Office of Robert Starr APC

23901 Calabasas Road Suite 2072

Calabasas, CA 91302

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew K Stefatos

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jacqueline Bruce Chinery

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kate S Lehrman

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B-MBUSA's Conformed Answer to Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit C-Redacted Sales Contract

1 #4

Exhibit D-Statement of Information

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-201) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha, this case is transferred from Judge Mark C. Scarsi to the calendar of Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-10271 FLA (KSx). (mrgo) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Andrew Kraynler.. (Starr, Robert) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNON CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, in Los Angeles Superior Court on 11/9/2020, attached as Exhibit B.(jtil) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Andrew Kraynler in Los Angeles Superior Court on 10/5/2020, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Jury Demand #4 served on November 9, 2020. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, identifying ANTHONY KRAYNLER, BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STCV11323 Receipt No: ACACDC-28930036 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-MBUSA's Conformed Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-Redacted Sales Contract, #4 Exhibit D-Statement of Information) (Attorney Andrew K Stefatos added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Theodore Richard Tang

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam Morris Rose

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert L Starr