This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2020 at 07:18:33 (UTC).

Tina Krauss v. U.S. Legal Support et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 Tina Krauss filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against U S Legal Support. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-02397

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tina Krauss

Defendants

U.S. Legal Support

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Michael Tomberlin, Jr

Attorney at Myers Law Group APC

9327 Fairway View Place Suite 100

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Ann Hendrix

Attorney at Myers Law Group APC

9327 Fairway View Place Suite 100

Ranch Cucamonga, CA 91730

David P Myers

Attorney at Myers Law Group APC

9327 Fairway View Place Suite 100

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Defendant Attorneys

Kara A Ritter

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

633 West Fifth Street 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Erika Lynn Shao

Attorney at Gordon Rees Sccully Mansukhani LLP

633 West Fifth Street 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Kelsey Lynne Wong

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

633 West 5Th Street 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, re Stipulation for Protective Order #8 (dc) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by defendant U.S. Legal Support, Inc. U.S. Legal Support.(Wong, Kelsey) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/13/2020. (ake) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge John A. Kronstadt. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-02397-JAK (SHKx). (et) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

3 #1

Certificate of Service

2 #1

Certificate of Service

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant U.S. Legal Support. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ritter, Kara) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

1 #6

Certificate of Service

1 #5

Exhibit B - Answer

1 #4

Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #3

Declaration of Kara A. Ritter

1 #1

Declaration of Shana M. Holton

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the County of San Bernardino, case number CIVDS1932455 with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 12/13/2019, receipt number 26M500B7), filed by Defendant U.S. Legal Support. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shana M. Holton, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration Shana M. Holton, #3 Declaration of Kara A. Ritter, #4 Exhibit A - Complaint, #5 Exhibit B - Answer, #6 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Kara A Ritter added to party U.S. Legal Support(pty:dft))(Ritter, Kara) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, re Stipulation for Protective Order #8 (dc) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by defendant U.S. Legal Support, Inc. U.S. Legal Support.(Wong, Kelsey) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/13/2020. (ake) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge John A. Kronstadt. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-02397-JAK (SHKx). (et) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants U.S. Legal Support, Does 1 through 10, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Tina Krauss. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/30/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant U.S. Legal Support, identifying Tina Krauss, US Legal Support Investment Holdings, LLC, and Chubb, N. American Financial Lines Claims. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ritter, Kara) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant U.S. Legal Support. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ritter, Kara) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the County of San Bernardino, case number CIVDS1932455 with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 12/13/2019, receipt number 26M500B7), filed by Defendant U.S. Legal Support. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shana M. Holton, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration Shana M. Holton, #3 Declaration of Kara A. Ritter, #4 Exhibit A - Complaint, #5 Exhibit B - Answer, #6 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Kara A Ritter added to party U.S. Legal Support(pty:dft))(Ritter, Kara) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. LEGAL SUPPORT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Michael Tomberlin, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ann Hendrix

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David P Myers