This case was last updated from PACER on 03/12/2019 at 07:28:06 (UTC).

Krause v. City of Omaha

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 Krause filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Omaha. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph F. Bataillon and Michael D. Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00012

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nebraska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph F. Bataillon

Referral Judge

Michael D. Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Randall S. Krause

Omaha, NE 68102

Defendant

City of Omaha

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Timothy G. Himes, Sr.

Attorney at CITY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - OMAHA

1819 Farnam Street, Suite 804, Omaha/Douglas Civic Center

Omaha, NE 68183

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Second Amended Complaint

#13

(#13) MOTION for Leave to Amend on behalf of Plaintiff Randall S. Krause. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint) (KLF) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 4/5/2019.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (DKM) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#10

(#10) The City's ANSWER to Amended Complaint #9 by City of Omaha (Himes, Timothy) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant City of Omaha filed by pro se plaintiff Randall S. Krause. (KLF) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Timothy G. Himes, Sr. on behalf of Defendant City of Omaha.(Himes, Timothy) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant City of Omaha on 1/14/2019. (KLF) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#5

(#5) REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that this case is reassigned to Senior District Judge Joseph F. Bataillon for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#4

(#4) GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant City of Omaha. (KLF) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against City of Omaha. 1 Summons issued with receipt number 8050232, in the amount of $400 filed on behalf of Randall S. Krause. (KLF) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Leave to Amend on behalf of Plaintiff Randall S. Krause. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint) (KLF) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER (Case Conference Instructions). ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (Copy mailed to pro se party along with filing #11 )(DKM) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 4/5/2019.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (DKM) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) The City's ANSWER to Amended Complaint #9 by City of Omaha (Himes, Timothy) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant City of Omaha filed by pro se plaintiff Randall S. Krause. (KLF) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. The City of Omaha shall have an extension of time to March 4, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Timothy G. Himes, Sr. on behalf of Defendant City of Omaha.(Himes, Timothy) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant City of Omaha on 1/14/2019. (KLF) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that this case is reassigned to Senior District Judge Joseph F. Bataillon for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant City of Omaha. (KLF) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against City of Omaha. 1 Summons issued with receipt number 8050232, in the amount of $400 filed on behalf of Randall S. Krause. (KLF) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.