This case was last updated from PACER on 08/11/2020 at 10:40:12 (UTC).

Krasniqi v. Holdahl, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/12/2020 Krasniqi filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Holdahl, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen E. Schreier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-04090

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen E. Schreier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Visar Krasniqi

Defendant

Holdahl, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Brandon D. Meshbesher

Attorney at Lind, Jensen, Sullivan & Peterson, P.A.

901 Marquette Avenue South, Suite 1300

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Vincent A. Purtell

Attorney at Heidepriem, Purtell, Siegel & Hinrichs LLP

101 W. 69Th Street, Suite 105

Sioux Falls, SD 57108

Shad E. Christman

Attorney at Heidepriem, Purtell, Siegel & Hinrichs LLP

101 W. 69Th Street, Suite 105

Sioux Falls, SD 57108

Brian A. Wood

Attorney at Lind Jensen, Sullivan & Peterson, P.A.

1300 At&T Tower, 901 Marquette Avenue S.

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/31/2021 Motions due by 6/30/2021. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on July 13, 2020. (DLC) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#9

(#9) Discovery Report Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Holdahl, Inc..(Meshbesher, Brandon) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brian A. Wood for Holdahl, Inc. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 6/30/20. (SKK) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#7

(#7) PROPOSED ORDER by Holdahl, Inc. re #5 MOTION for Attorney Brian A. Wood to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3341209) (Meshbesher, Brandon) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #5 MOTION for Attorney Brian A. Wood to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3341209) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Holdahl, Inc.. (Meshbesher, Brandon) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Attorney Brian A. Wood to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3341209) by Holdahl, Inc.. (Meshbesher, Brandon) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice for Removal of Civil Action, Civil Cover Sheet and Answer served on Vincent A. Purtell on 6/12/20, filed by Holdahl, Inc.. (Meshbesher, Brandon) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 06/15/2020. (SAC) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

2 #1

Certificate of Service Affidavit of Service for for Notice of Removal, Answer an

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Holdahl, Inc.. (FILED IN ERROR: Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Affidavit of Service for for Notice of Removal, Answer and Civil Cover Sheet) See Doc. #4 for updated Affidavit (Meshbesher, Brandon) Modified to correct docket text on 6/16/2020 (MSB). (Entered: 06/15/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Visar Krasniqi ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3333515) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint)(SAC) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/31/2021 Motions due by 6/30/2021. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on July 13, 2020. (DLC) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Discovery Report Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Holdahl, Inc..(Meshbesher, Brandon) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brian A. Wood for Holdahl, Inc. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 6/30/20. (SKK) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROPOSED ORDER by Holdahl, Inc. re #5 MOTION for Attorney Brian A. Wood to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3341209) (Meshbesher, Brandon) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #5 MOTION for Attorney Brian A. Wood to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3341209) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Holdahl, Inc.. (Meshbesher, Brandon) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Attorney Brian A. Wood to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3341209) by Holdahl, Inc.. (Meshbesher, Brandon) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice for Removal of Civil Action, Civil Cover Sheet and Answer served on Vincent A. Purtell on 6/12/20, filed by Holdahl, Inc.. (Meshbesher, Brandon) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 06/15/2020. (SAC) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Holdahl, Inc.. (FILED IN ERROR: Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Affidavit of Service for for Notice of Removal, Answer and Civil Cover Sheet) See Doc. #4 for updated Affidavit (Meshbesher, Brandon) Modified to correct docket text on 6/16/2020 (MSB). (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Visar Krasniqi ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3333515) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint)(SAC) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less