This case was last updated from PACER on 03/23/2019 at 07:02:04 (UTC).

Krasne v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 Krasne filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael M. Anello and Michael S. Berg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00135

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael M. Anello

Referral Judge

Michael S. Berg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mari-Ann Krasne

Defendant

Life Insurance Company of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John P. Stennett

Attorney at Stennett and Stennett

501 West Broadway, Suite 1340

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Daniel W. Maguire

Attorney at Burke, Williams & Sorensen LLP

444 South Flower Street, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Order Confirming Settlement and Setting Deadline to File Joint Motion to Dismiss. In light of the settlement, the parties are ordered to file their Joint Motion to Dismiss this case, signed by counsel of record and any unrepresented parties, no later than 4/18/2019. A proposed order granting the joint motion must be e-mailed to the assigned district judge's chambers on the same day. If the fully executed Joint Motion to Dismiss is not filed by 4/18/2019, then all counsel of record and unrepresented parties are required to appear in person for a Settlement Disposition Conference. The Settlement Disposition Conference will be held on 4/23/2019 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2C with Magistrate Judge Berg. If the parties file their Joint Motion to Dismiss on or before 4/18/2019, the Settlement Disposition Conference will be vacated without further court order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 3/11/2019.(rmc) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

8 #1

Proof of Service

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Settlement by Mari-Ann Krasne (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Stennett, John) (rmc). (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER Granting #6 Second Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Upon due consideration, good cause appearing, the Court grants the parties' joint motion. Defendant must respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 3/12/2019. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 2/25/2019. (rmc) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

6 #1

Certificate of Service

#6

(#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maguire, Daniel) Modified to correct event on 2/25/2019 (rmc). (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER Granting #4 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant must respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 2/26/2019. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 2/6/2019. (rmc) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

4 #1

Certificate of Service

#4

(#4) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maguire, Daniel)Attorney Daniel W. Maguire added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft) (rmc). (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mari-Ann Krasne. Life Insurance Company of North America served. (Stennett, John) (rmc). (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mme) (jao). (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12110556.), filed by Mari-Ann Krasne.The new case number is 3:19-cv-00135-MMA-MSB. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Stennett, John)(mme) (jao). (Entered: 01/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Order Confirming Settlement and Setting Deadline to File Joint Motion to Dismiss. In light of the settlement, the parties are ordered to file their Joint Motion to Dismiss this case, signed by counsel of record and any unrepresented parties, no later than 4/18/2019. A proposed order granting the joint motion must be e-mailed to the assigned district judge's chambers on the same day. If the fully executed Joint Motion to Dismiss is not filed by 4/18/2019, then all counsel of record and unrepresented parties are required to appear in person for a Settlement Disposition Conference. The Settlement Disposition Conference will be held on 4/23/2019 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2C with Magistrate Judge Berg. If the parties file their Joint Motion to Dismiss on or before 4/18/2019, the Settlement Disposition Conference will be vacated without further court order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 3/11/2019.(rmc) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Settlement by Mari-Ann Krasne (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Stennett, John) (rmc). (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER Granting #6 Second Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Upon due consideration, good cause appearing, the Court grants the parties' joint motion. Defendant must respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 3/12/2019. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 2/25/2019. (rmc) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maguire, Daniel) Modified to correct event on 2/25/2019 (rmc). (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER Granting #4 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant must respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 2/26/2019. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 2/6/2019. (rmc) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maguire, Daniel)Attorney Daniel W. Maguire added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft) (rmc). (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mari-Ann Krasne. Life Insurance Company of North America served. (Stennett, John) (rmc). (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mme) (jao). (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12110556.), filed by Mari-Ann Krasne.The new case number is 3:19-cv-00135-MMA-MSB. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Stennett, John)(mme) (jao). (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less