This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/18/2022 at 07:55:35 (UTC).

Kranz v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 Kranz filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Juul Labs, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-04221

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric Kranz

Defendants

Juul Labs, Inc.

Altria Group, Inc.

Philip Morris USA, Inc.

Altria Client Services LLC

Altria Group Distribution Company

Altria Enterprises LLC

James Monsees

Adam Bowen

Nicholas Pritzker

Hoyoung Huh

Riaz Valani

Mother Murphys Labs, Inc.

Alternative Ingredients, Inc.

Tobacco Technology, Inc.

eLiquitech, Inc.

McLane Company, Inc.

Eby-Brown Company, LLC

Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mikal C. Watts

Attorney at Watts Guerra LLP

5726 W. Hausman Road Suite 119

San Antonio, TX 78249

Alicia ONeill

Attorney at Watts Guerra LLP

5726 W. Hausman Road, Suite 119

San Antonio, TX 78249

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Watts, Mikal) (Filed on 7/20/2022) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Hoyoung Huh, Juul Labs, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphys Labs, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, eLiquitech, Inc.. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2022) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Kranz. Alternative Ingredients, Inc. served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; Altria Client Services LLC served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; Altria Enterprises LLC served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; Altria Group Distribution Company served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; Altria Group, Inc. served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; Adam Bowen served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc. served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; Eby-Brown Company, LLC served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; Hoyoung Huh served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; Juul Labs, Inc. served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; McLane Company, Inc. served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; James Monsees served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; Mother Murphys Labs, Inc. served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; Philip Morris USA, Inc. served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; Nicholas Pritzker served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; Tobacco Technology, Inc. served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; Riaz Valani served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; eLiquitech, Inc. served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022. (Watts, Mikal) (Filed on 8/5/2022) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Kranz. Alternative Ingredients, Inc. served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; Altria Client Services LLC served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; Altria Enterprises LLC served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; Altria Group Distribution Company served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; Altria Group, Inc. served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; Adam Bowen served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc. served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; Eby-Brown Company, LLC served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; Hoyoung Huh served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; Juul Labs, Inc. served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; McLane Company, Inc. served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; James Monsees served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; Mother Murphys Labs, Inc. served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; Philip Morris USA, Inc. served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; Nicholas Pritzker served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; Tobacco Technology, Inc. served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; Riaz Valani served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; eLiquitech, Inc. served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022. (Watts, Mikal) (Filed on 8/5/2022) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Hoyoung Huh, Juul Labs, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphys Labs, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, eLiquitech, Inc.. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2022) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketDIRECT MEMBER CASE OPENED re MDL 2913. Opened in California Northern District as 3:22-cv-04221-WHO Kranz v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2022) (Entered: 08/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2022) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Watts, Mikal) (Filed on 7/20/2022) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT - SHORT FORM - (with Jury Demand) against Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Hoyoung Huh, Juul Labs, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphys Labs, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, eLiquitech, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17367641.). Filed byEric Kranz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Watts, Mikal) (Filed on 7/20/2022) Modified on 7/21/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc. is a litigant