This case was last updated from PACER on 06/13/2020 at 15:48:58 (UTC).

Kramer v. Alterra Mountain Company et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2020 Kramer filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Alterra Mountain Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are S. Kato Crews and Raymond P. Moore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01057

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

S. Kato Crews

Presiding Judge

Raymond P. Moore

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Robert Stephen Kramer

Donald Wayne Lang

Timothy Goodrich

Nolte Mehnert

Consolidated Plaintiffs

Brian Eckert

Edward Kress

Joseph Panganiban

Phillip Werner

Colleen Murphy

Ryan Collins

Sofia Malachowsky

Milan Steijn

George T. Farmer

Vanessa Cleaver

Abbas Gokal

Steven Blum

Dale Pearman

Defendants

Alterra Mountain Company

Ikon Pass, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ty Cheung Gee

Attorney at Haddon Morgan & Foreman, P.C.

150 East 10Th Avenue

Denver, CO 80203

Gregory Scott Dovel

Attorney at Dovel & Luner LLP

201 Santa Monica Boulevard, #600

Santa Monica, CA 90401-2212

Jeffrey S. Pagliuca

Attorney at Haddon Morgan & Foreman, P.C.

150 East 10Th Avenue

Denver, CO 80203

Jonas B. Jacobson

Attorney at Dovel & Luner LLP

201 Santa Monica Boulevard, Suite 600

Santa Monica, CA 90401-2212

Consolidated Plaintiff Attorneys

Rusty Evan Glenn

Attorney at Shuman Glenn & Stecker-Denver

600 17Th Street, Suite 2800 South

Denver, CO 80202

Jordan Laurence Lurie

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP-Los Angeles

1100 Glendon Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90034

Michael R. Cashman

Attorney at Hellmuth & Johnson, PLLC

8050 West 78Th Street

Edina, MN 55439

Richard Michael Hagstrom

Attorney at Hellmuth & Johnson, PLLC

8050 West 78Th Street

Edina, MN 55439

Nyran Rose Rasche

Attorney at Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP-IL

150 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 3000

Chicago, IL 60606

Joseph G. Sauder

Attorney at Sauder Schelkopf LLC

1109 Lancaster Avenue, Suite 300

Berwyn, PA 19312

Bryan L. Clobes

Attorney at Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP-PA

205 North Monroe Street

Media, PA 10963

Kathryn J. Stimson

Attorney at Stimson Stancil LaBranche Hubbard LLC

1652 North Downing Street

Denver, CO 80218

Jamie Hughes Hubbard

Attorney at Stimson Stancil LaBranche Hubbard LLC

1652 North Downing Street

Denver, CO 80218

Craig Richard Valentine

Attorney at Norton Frickey, P.C.

2301 East Pikes Peak Avenue, Suite 205

Colorado Springs, CO 80909

Stuart McKinley Paynter

Attorney at Paynter Law Firm PLLC-DC

1200 G Street N.W., Suite 800

Washington, DC 20005

Robert Bruce Carey

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP-Phoenix

11 West Jefferson Street, Suite 1000

Phoenix, AZ 85003

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Michael Unthank

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

Kathryn A. Reilly

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

Natalie Elizabeth West

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

Ryan William Cooke

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

4 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#39

#38

#37

#35

#34

#33

30 #1

*Restricted*

#30

26 #4

Exhibit A, Evangelista Worley LLP Firm Resume

#6

#5

#4

3 #2

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

3 #1

Summons

#3

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Proposed Scheduling Order (Joint) by Consol Plaintiffs Steven Blum, Vanessa Cleaver, Ryan Collins, Brian Eckert, George T. Farmer, Abbas Gokal, Edward Kress, Sofia Malachowsky, Colleen Murphy, Joseph Panganiban, Dale Pearman, Milan Steijn, Phillip Werner, Plaintiffs Timothy Goodrich, Robert Stephen Kramer, Donald Wayne Lang, Nolte Mehnert. (Stimson, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER. The Joint Motion to Consolidate (ECF No. #37 ) is GRANTED; Kress v. Alterra Mountain Co., 20-cv-01583-RM, is hereby consolidated with 20-cv-01057-RM-SKC for pretrial proceedings; all papers in this consolidated action shall be filed in the lowest case number, No. 20-cv-01057-RM-SKC; the parties in the Kress Action shall participate in the status conference set for June 18, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. MDT, as set forth in the Orders dated May 26,2020 (ECF No. #30 ) and June 4, 2020 (ECF No. 36 ); and that this Order shall also be filed in Civil Action No. 20-cv-01583-RM. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/4/2020. (rvill, ) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendants Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc.. (Reilly, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte upon the consolidation of the Blum Action #34 and the receipt of the MDL "Order Deeming Motion Withdrawn" #35 . Upon consideration of these filings, the Court finds there is no need to discuss the matters set forth in its Minute Orders of May 28, 2020 [ECF No. 31] and June 2, 2020 [ECF No. 32]. Instead, the Court finds the matters set forth in its Order of May 26, 2020 #30 should be discussed, but the Court will accept any joint proposed pre-trial schedules filed by June 10, 2020. It is therefore ORDERED that the parties are directed to be prepared to discuss the matters set forth in the Order of May 26, 2020. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/4/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Order Deeming Motion Withdrawn. Before the Panel is a motion by plaintiffs Michael McAuliffe and George T. Farmer, filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. In their motion, plaintiffs seeks centralization of the actions on the attached schedule in the United States District Court for the District of Colorado for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Movants now seeks to withdraw their Section 1407 motion. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion for transfer under 28 U.S.C. 1407 is DEEMED WITHDRAWN. MDL 2943 (evana, ) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER. The Joint Motion to Consolidate (ECF No. #33 ) is GRANTED; Blum v. Alterra Mountain Co., 20-cv-01520-RM-SKC, is hereby consolidated with 20-cv-01057-RM-SKC for pretrial proceedings; all papers in this consolidated action shall be filed in the lowest case number, No. 20-cv-01057-RM-SKC, and that this Order shall also be filed in Civil Action No. 20-cv-01520-RM-SKC. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/3/2020. (rvill, ) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendants Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc.. (Reilly, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • Docket(#32) MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte upon the reassignment of Civil Action No. 20-cv-1520, Blum v. Alterra Mountain Co., to this Court. Upon such review, the Court finds (1) the parties in Blum shall participate in the status conference set for June 18, 2020; and (2) all parties shall be prepared to also discuss consolidating Blum for pretrial purposes with this consolidated action. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/2/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte upon consideration of In Re: NATIONAL SKI PASS CONSUMER LITIGATION - MDL No. 2943 and the motion for transfer currently pending in that litigation. In light of the pending motion for transfer, the Court will convert the status conference set to discuss matters such as the briefing for appointment of liaison counsel to a status conference to address MDL 2943 and its impact on the consolidated cases before this Court and other related issues. The briefing on the Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Counsel #26 remains STAYED pending further order of the Court. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/28/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER. A Status Conference is set for 6/18/2020 at 10:00 AM MDT in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. To assist in the preservation of public health and safety while effectively administering justice in this case, the Court has determined that the status conference shall be held via video teleconference (VTC) and audio teleconference for attorneys of record, and listen only for all others. It is ORDERED that the briefing on the motion for appointment of interim co-lead counsel (ECF No. #26 ) is hereby STAYED until further order of the Court. The Instructions (Exhibit 1) for attorneys shall be placed under a Level 1 restriction. However, any non-attorney or member of the public may listen to the status conference by calling Toll Free: 888-636-3807, using Access Code: 4296144#. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/26/2020. (rvill, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/26/2020: #1 Exhibit 1) (rvill, ). (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Reilly, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Stephen Kramer. Ikon Pass, Inc. served on 4/16/2020, answer due 5/7/2020. (Jacobson, Jonas) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Stephen Kramer. Alterra Mountain Company served on 4/16/2020, answer due 5/7/2020. (Jacobson, Jonas) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Simon Carlo Franzini on behalf of Robert Stephen KramerAttorney Simon Carlo Franzini added to party Robert Stephen Kramer(pty:pla) (Franzini, Simon) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonas B. Jacobson on behalf of Robert Stephen KramerAttorney Jonas B. Jacobson added to party Robert Stephen Kramer(pty:pla) (Jacobson, Jonas) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ty Cheung Gee on behalf of Robert Stephen KramerAttorney Ty Cheung Gee added to party Robert Stephen Kramer(pty:pla) (Gee, Ty) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Pagliuca on behalf of Robert Stephen KramerAttorney Jeffrey S. Pagliuca added to party Robert Stephen Kramer(pty:pla) (Pagliuca, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT class action against Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7251472)Attorney Gregory Scott Dovel added to party Robert Stephen Kramer(pty:pla), filed by Robert Stephen Kramer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Dovel, Gregory) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ikon Pass, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Alterra Mountain Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordan Laurence Lurie

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stuart McKinley Paynter