This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/18/2022 at 08:42:44 (UTC).

KOZIK v. COOK INCORPORATED et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 KOZIK filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against COOK INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-06846

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAYMOND D. KOZIK

Defendants

COOK INCORPORATED

COOK MEDICAL LLC

WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher James Moore

Attorney at Richardson Thomas Haltiwanger Moore and Lewis LLC

1513 Hampton Street, 1St Floor

Columbia, SC 29201

Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller

2425 East Camelback Road, Suite 500

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Defendant Attorneys

Andrea Roberts Pierson

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Kip S.M. McDonald

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Raymond D Kozik against Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, and Cook Medical, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10535791.) Service due by 9/13/2022. (rshu, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#2

(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Raymond D Kozik. (rshu, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, and Cook Medical, LLC. (rshu, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#5

(#5) Case transferred to Southern District of Indiana per certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order Number CTO-211. The Transferring Clerk's Office hereby attests the record and the docket sheet available through CM/ECF to be the certified list. (cper, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 07/20/2022)

6 #6

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

6 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) Third Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 7/20/2022.(LBT) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#6

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01017-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01040-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01299-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01300-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01312-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01325-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01346-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01347-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01373-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01440-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01447-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01470-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01510-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01513-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01517-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06823-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06836-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06837-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06838-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06842-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06843-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06845-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06846-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06848-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06856-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#7

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01017-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01040-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01299-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01300-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01312-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01325-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01346-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01347-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01373-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01440-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01447-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01470-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01510-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01513-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01517-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06823-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06836-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06837-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06838-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06842-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06843-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06845-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06846-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06848-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06856-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by RAYMOND KOZIK.Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06846-RLY-TAB(Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier on behalf of MDL Plaintiff RAYMOND KOZIK. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06846-RLY-TAB (Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01017-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01040-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01299-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01300-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01312-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01325-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01346-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01347-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01373-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01440-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01447-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01470-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01510-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01513-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01517-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06823-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06836-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06837-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06838-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06842-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06843-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06845-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06846-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06848-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06856-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01017-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01040-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01299-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01300-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01312-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01325-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01346-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01347-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01373-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01440-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01447-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01470-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01510-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01513-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01517-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06823-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06836-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06837-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06838-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06842-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06843-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06845-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06846-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06848-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06856-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier on behalf of MDL Plaintiff RAYMOND KOZIK. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06846-RLY-TAB (Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by RAYMOND KOZIK.Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06846-RLY-TAB(Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • Docket(#8) Remark - Case Transferred In from District of Connecticut, Cause No. 3:22-cv-781 on 7/12/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6842-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of Connecticut, Cause No. 3:22-cv-782 on 7/12/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6843-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of Maryland, Cause No. 8:22-cv-1244 on 7/11/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6844-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of New Hampshire, Cause No. 1:22-cv-227 on 7/11/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6845-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of South Carolina, Cause No. 2:22-cv-1840 on 7/20/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6846-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06842-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06843-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06844-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06845-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06846-RLY-TAB(LBT) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Third Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 7/20/2022.(LBT) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case transferred in from District of South Carolina; Case Number 2:22-cv-01840. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred to Southern District of Indiana per certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order Number CTO-211. The Transferring Clerk's Office hereby attests the record and the docket sheet available through CM/ECF to be the certified list. (cper, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, and Cook Medical, LLC. (rshu, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Raymond D Kozik. (rshu, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Raymond D Kozik against Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, and Cook Medical, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10535791.) Service due by 9/13/2022. (rshu, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COOK MEDICAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COOK INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kip S.M. McDonald