This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/09/2020 at 07:18:19 (UTC).

K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD v. Gottschalk et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Gottschalk. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Louis L. Stanton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11309

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louis L. Stanton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD

Defendant

Robert Gottschalk

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven S. Hansen

Attorney at GSG, Inc.

714 Fourth Avenue, Suite 200

Fairbanks, AK 99701

Natalie Rainforth Poteet

Attorney at Doner Law, PLC

1750 Tysons Blvd., Suite 1500

Tysons Corner, VA 22102

Karen Ann Doner

Attorney at Doner Law, PLC

1750 Tysons Blvd., Suite 1500

Tysons Corner, VA 22102

Reuben Lael Borman

Attorney at Poulos LoPiccolo PC

311 W. 43Rd St., Ste. 11-124

New York, NY 10036

Defendant Attorneys

Robert Walter Ottinger

Attorney at The Ottinger Firm, P.C.

535 Mission St., Fl 14

San Francisco, CA 94105-3253

Robert Walter Ottinger, Jr

Attorney at The Ottinger Firm, P.C.

401 Park Avenue South, 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

 

Court Documents

#44

#43

42 #1

Certificate of Mailing

#42

41 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Admission Pro Hac Vice

41 #1

Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion

#41

8 #2

Proposed Order

8 #1

Exhibit

7 #1

Unissued Summons re Defendant Global Food Services LLC

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #41 Motion for Karen A. Doner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 1/23/2020) (rro) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ORDER FOR CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO RULE 16(b): Initial Conference set for 2/14/2020 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 1/13/2020) (rro) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Robert Gottschalk. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Mailing)(Ottinger, Robert) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #41 FIRST MOTION for Karen A. Doner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18465500. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) FIRST MOTION for Karen A. Doner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18465500. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Borman, Reuben) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: Notice is hereby given that, subject to approval by the Court, Plaintiff K'oyitl'ots'ina, Ltd. substitutes Reuben Borman, New York Bar No. 4245759, as counsel ofrecord in place of Steven S. Hansen. Contact information for new counsel is as follows: as further set forth in this Order. The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and so ORDERED. (Attorney Reuben Lael Borman for K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD added. Attorney Steven S. Hansen terminated.) (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 1/6/2020) (rro) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) PROPOSED ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD. (Borman, Reuben) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REJECTION OF PROPOSED CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Notice to Attorney Robert Ottinger re: Document #38 Notice (Other), was rejected by the Clerk's Office for the following reason, the Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge should not be electronically filed. Please download and review the Local Rules, Judge's Individual Rules of Practice and ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions.. (dt) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - < NOTICE of CONSENT, AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Document filed by Robert Gottschalk. (Ottinger, Robert) Modified on 12/17/2019 (dt). (Entered: 12/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Louis L. Stanton. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM Motion for Preliminary Injunction by K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD. (Hansen, Steven) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/11/2019.] (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Hansen, Steven) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/11/2019.] (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Global Food Services LLC and Robert Gottschalk. (LMH, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/11/2019.] (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unissued summons re Defendant R. Gottschalk, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Global Food Services LLC)(LMH, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/11/2019.] (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Natalie Rainforth Poteet by K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD.(Hansen, Steven) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/11/2019.] (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Karen A. Doner by K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD.(Hansen, Steven) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/11/2019.] (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD. (Hansen, Steven) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/11/2019.] (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD. (Hansen, Steven) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/11/2019.] (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (Hansen, Steven) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/11/2019.] (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2757823.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hansen, Steven) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/11/2019.] (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karen Ann Doner