This case was last updated from PACER on 07/07/2019 at 08:13:48 (UTC).

Kowalski v. Bukowski

Case Summary

On 05/08/2019 Kowalski filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Bukowski. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara Darrow. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02124

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara Darrow

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Robert M Kowalski

Kankakee, IL 60901

Respondents

Timothy Bukowski

Chad Kolitwenzew

Interested Party

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorney

Greggory R Walters

Attorney at US ATTY

One Technology Plaza, Suite 400, 211 Fulton St

Peoria, IL 61602

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) JUDGMENT entered. (KB, ilcd) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 5/21/2019. For these reasons, the Court finds Petitioner Robert M. Kowalski's Petition #1 must be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to exhaust his direct appeals. Additionally, the Clerk is DIRECTED to add Chad Kolitwenzew and terminate Timothy Bukowski as Respondent in this case. The United States is named as Interested Party. This case is CLOSED. (KB, ilcd) Modified on 5/24/2019 to reflect add/term parties (ED, ilcd). (Entered: 05/22/2019)

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) filed by Robert M Kowalski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(KM, ilcd) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) JUDGMENT entered. (KB, ilcd) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 5/21/2019. For these reasons, the Court finds Petitioner Robert M. Kowalski's Petition #1 must be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to exhaust his direct appeals. Additionally, the Clerk is DIRECTED to add Chad Kolitwenzew and terminate Timothy Bukowski as Respondent in this case. The United States is named as Interested Party. This case is CLOSED. (KB, ilcd) Modified on 5/24/2019 to reflect add/term parties (ED, ilcd). (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 24626008677 (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • TEXT ORDER: Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 5/9/2019. Petitioner has filed a Petition for Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Petitioner is directed to either pay the $5 filing fee or provide the Court with a signed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs that also includes a copy of his trust fund ledger, certified by the appropriate institutional officer, showing all receipts, expenditures and balances for the last six months. Petitioner shall do so on or before June 7, 2019, or the Court will dismiss the case without prejudice for failure to pay the filing fee. (LN, ilcd) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) filed by Robert M Kowalski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(KM, ilcd) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.