This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/15/2021 at 10:45:34 (UTC).

Kovach v. MFA, Incorporated

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 Kovach filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against MFA, Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Willie J. Epps, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04227

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Willie J. Epps, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephanie Kovach

Defendant

MFA, Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benjamin B. Nelson

Attorney at Allen & Nelson, PC

29 E. Ash St.

Columbia, MO 65203

Defendant Attorneys

Robert D. Younger

Attorney at McMahon Berger

2730 North Ballas Road, Suite 200, P. O. Box 31901

St. Louis, MO 63131-3039

Thomas Owen McCarthy

Attorney at McMahon Berger

2730 North Ballas Road, Suite 200, P. O. Box 31901

St. Louis, MO 63131-3039

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (Geiser, Angel) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #3 motion to dismiss case. Signed on 12/15/2020 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. (Hayter, Cailynn) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#10

(#10) REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #3 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Robert D. Younger on behalf of Defendant MFA, Incorporated. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Younger, Robert) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

9 #1

Magistrate Consent

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Magistrate Assignment Returned by Plaintiff, Stephanie Kovach and Defendant, MFA Incorporated. Jurisdiction by magistrate accepted. ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent)(Berner, Crystal) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#8

(#8) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #3 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Benjamin B. Nelson on behalf of Plaintiff Stephanie Kovach. Reply suggestions due by 12/14/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Nelson, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Robert D. Younger on behalf of Defendant MFA, Incorporated.(Younger, Robert) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

6 #1

MAP General Order

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Berner, Crystal) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

4 #2

Exhibit 2

4 #1

Exhibit 1

#4

(#4) SUGGESTIONS in support re #3 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Robert D. Younger on behalf of Defendant MFA, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #3 ) (Younger, Robert) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

3 #2

Exhibit 2

3 #1

Exhibit 1

#3

(#3) MOTION to dismiss case filed by Robert D. Younger on behalf of MFA, Incorporated. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/30/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Younger, Robert) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal (to Plaintiff) by MFA, Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal, (Younger, Robert) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (Geiser, Angel) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #3 motion to dismiss case. Signed on 12/15/2020 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. (Hayter, Cailynn) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #3 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Robert D. Younger on behalf of Defendant MFA, Incorporated. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Younger, Robert) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Magistrate Assignment Returned by Plaintiff, Stephanie Kovach and Defendant, MFA Incorporated. Jurisdiction by magistrate accepted. ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent)(Berner, Crystal) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #3 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Benjamin B. Nelson on behalf of Plaintiff Stephanie Kovach. Reply suggestions due by 12/14/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Nelson, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Robert D. Younger on behalf of Defendant MFA, Incorporated.(Younger, Robert) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff and Defendant: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 12/7/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Berner, Crystal) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Berner, Crystal) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • Docket(#5) ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 11/16/2020 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUGGESTIONS in support re #3 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Robert D. Younger on behalf of Defendant MFA, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #3 ) (Younger, Robert) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to dismiss case filed by Robert D. Younger on behalf of MFA, Incorporated. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/30/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Younger, Robert) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal (to Plaintiff) by MFA, Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal, (Younger, Robert) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Boone County, MO County, case number 20BA-CV03292, filed by Robert D. Younger on behalf of MFA, Incorporated. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-7146659. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Younger, Robert) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MFA Incorporated is a litigant