This case was last updated from PACER on 07/27/2019 at 07:49:41 (UTC).

Koussa v. IRS/FBAR

Case Summary

On 05/28/2019 Koussa filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against IRS/FBAR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rebecca Rutherford and Karen Gren Scholer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01271

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Rebecca Rutherford

Presiding Judge

Karen Gren Scholer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ramsey A Koussa

Rockwall, TX 75087

Ramsey Adel Koussa

Rockwall, TX 75087

Defendant

IRS/FBAR

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against IRS/FBAR filed by Ramsey Adel Koussa. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (zkc) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ramsey A Koussa. (zkc) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (zkc) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

8 #1

Copy of Fed. R. Civ. P. 4

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ramsey A Koussa. (zkc) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against IRS/FBAR filed by Ramsey A Koussa. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (zkc) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

8 #2

Copy of Local Rule 4.1

#1

(#1) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER: Plaintiff paid the required filing fee in this case. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c), Plaintiff is now responsible for serving a summons and complaint on Defendants. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send summons forms, a copy of Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, and a copy of Local Rule 4.1 to Plaintiff. Plaintiff shall have 90 days from the date of this order to serve Defendants. After docketing of this Order, this case shall be referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford for further proceedings. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 6/27/2019) (Attachments: #1 Copy of Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, #2 Copy of Local Rule 4.1) (zkc) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER: The Court will defer ruling on Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis and will grant Plaintiff 30 days from the date of this order to pay the filing fee. Failure to pay the filing fee will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 5/30/2019) (zkc) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: Plaintiff paid the required filing fee in this case. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c), Plaintiff is now responsible for serving a summons and complaint on Defendants. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send summons forms, a copy of Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, and a copy of Local Rule 4.1 to Plaintiff. Plaintiff shall have 90 days from the date of this order to serve Defendants. After docketing of this Order, this case shall be referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford for further proceedings. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 6/27/2019) (Attachments: #1 Copy of Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, #2 Copy of Local Rule 4.1) (zkc) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against IRS/FBAR filed by Ramsey Adel Koussa. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (zkc) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 6. Thu May 30 13:33:32 CDT 2019 (crt) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER: The Court will defer ruling on Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis and will grant Plaintiff 30 days from the date of this order to pay the filing fee. Failure to pay the filing fee will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 5/30/2019) (zkc) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ramsey A Koussa. (zkc) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ramsey A Koussa. (zkc) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against IRS/FBAR filed by Ramsey A Koussa. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (zkc) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 1, 2. Tue May 28 16:50:13 CDT 2019 (crt) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (zkc) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.