This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2020 at 09:21:02 (UTC).

Koumalatsos v. Town of Holly Ridge, North Carolina et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 Koumalatsos filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Town of Holly Ridge, North Carolina. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Louise Wood Flanagan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-00136

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louise Wood Flanagan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nicholas Koumalatsos

Defendants

Town Manager Heather Reynolds

Town of Holly Ridge, North Carolina

Mayor Jeff Wenzel

Captain Ewan Richards

Lori Faircloth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brandon C. Pettijohn

Attorney at Coastal Legal Counsel

205 N. 5Th Avenue

Wilmington, NC 28401

Aaron Daniel Lindquist

Attorney at Coastal Legal Counsel

205 N. 5Th Avenue

Wilmington, NC 28401

Defendant Attorney

Clay Allen Collier

Attorney at Crossley McIntosh Collier Hanley & Edes, PLLC

5002 Randall Parkway

Wilmington, NC 28403

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

5 #4

Proposed Summons Jeff Wenzel

5 #3

Proposed Summons Holly Ridge

5 #2

Proposed Summons Ewan Richards

5 #1

Proposed Summons Heather Reynolds

#5

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Notice of Appearance filed by Brandon C. Pettijohn on behalf of Nicholas Koumalatsos. (Pettijohn, Brandon) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Heather Reynolds, Jeff Wenzel, Ewan Richards, Town of Holly Ridge, North Carolina, Lori Faircloth. Nicholas Koumalatsos waiver sent on 7/20/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Collier, Clay) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Financial Disclosure Statement by Jeff Wenzel (Collier, Clay) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Financial Disclosure Statement by Ewan Richards (Collier, Clay) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Financial Disclosure Statement by Heather Reynolds (Collier, Clay) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Financial Disclosure Statement by Town of Holly Ridge, North Carolina (Collier, Clay) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Financial Disclosure Statement by Lori Faircloth (Collier, Clay) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Appearance filed by Clay Allen Collier on behalf of Jeff Wenzel. (Collier, Clay) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Appearance filed by Clay Allen Collier on behalf of Ewan Richards. (Collier, Clay) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance filed by Clay Allen Collier on behalf of Heather Reynolds. (Collier, Clay) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketCase Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #4 Notice of Appearance on behalf of attorneys David Ervin and Brandon Pettijohn. Pursuant to Section VI.C.2 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, each attorney making an appearance in the case must be a registered CM/ECF filer with this court and must file his or her own Notice of Appearance. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Aaron Daniel Lindquist on behalf of Nicholas Koumalatsos. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance) (Lindquist, Aaron) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by Nicholas Koumalatsos (Lindquist, Aaron) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5522466.), filed by Nicholas Koumalatsos. (Lindquist, Aaron) Modified on 7/20/2020 (Collins, S.). (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Nicholas Koumalatsos. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. Filing is not text searchable. Local Civil Rule 5.1 requires that all documents submitted for filing be in a text searchable format. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #2 ** COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5522466.), filed by Nicholas Koumalatsos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lindquist, Aaron) Modified on 7/20/2020 (Collins, S.) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less