This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 15:41:21 (UTC).

Kostantine Panagiotis Lois et al v. Benjamin Joseph Levin et al

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 Kostantine Panagiotis Lois filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Benjamin Joseph Levin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen V. Wilson and Autumn D. Spaeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04305

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Shane Jarret Williams

Konstantine Panagiotis Lois

Defendants

Friends Keep Secrets, Inc.

Benjamin Joseph Levin p/k/a Benny Blanco

Nicolette Frangipane p/k/a Halsey

Edward Christopher Sheeran

Khalid Donnel Robinson p/k/a Khalid

Nathan Perez p/k/a Happy Perez

UMG Recordings, Inc. doing business as Interscope Records

Benjamin Joseph Levin

Ashley Nicolette Frangipane

Nathan Perez

Khalid Donnel Robinson

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mathew K Higbee

Attorney at Higbee and Associates

1504 Brookhollow Drive Suite 112

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Naomi Manea Sarega

Attorney at Higbee and Associates

1504 Brookhollow Drive Suite 112

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Ryan E Carreon

Attorney at Higbee and Associates

1504 Brookhollow Drive Suite 112

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Steven T Lowe

Attorney at Lowe and Associates APC

8383 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1038

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Defendant Attorneys

Michael J Niborski

Attorney at Pryor Cashman LLP

1801 Century Park East 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2302

Benjamin S Akley

Attorney at Pryor Cashman LLP

1801 Century Park East 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2302

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • Docket(#17) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), #16 . Defendants Ashley Nicolette Frangipane, Friends Keep Secrets, Inc., Benjamin Joseph Levin, and UMG Recordings, Inc. answers due 8/23/2021. (mrgo) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 23, 2021 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Ashley Nicolette Frangipane, Friends Keep Secrets, Inc., Benjamin Joseph Levin, Nathan Perez, Edward Christopher Sheeran, UMG Recordings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin S. Akley, #2 Proposed Order)(Attorney Benjamin S Akley added to party Ashley Nicolette Frangipane(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin S Akley added to party Friends Keep Secrets, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin S Akley added to party Benjamin Joseph Levin(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin S Akley added to party Nathan Perez(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin S Akley added to party Edward Christopher Sheeran(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin S Akley added to party UMG Recordings, Inc.(pty:dft))(Akley, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • Docket(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Konstantine Panagiotis Lois, upon Defendant Nathan Perez served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon TRACIE M. PEREZ - WIFE/CO-OCCUPANT in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docket(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Konstantine Panagiotis Lois. upon UMG Recordings, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/7/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Anthony Gambol. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docket(#13) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Shane Jarret Williams, Konstantine Panagiotis Lois. upon Edward Christopher Sheeran waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/25/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Andrew M. Goldsmith. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docket(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Ashley Nicolette Frangipane, Friends Keep Secrets, Inc., Benjamin Joseph Levin, Nathan Perez, Khalid Donnel Robinson, Edward Christopher Sheeran, UMG Recordings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Defendant Ashley Nicolette Frangipane, #2 Summons for Defendant Nathan Perez, #3 Summons for Defendant Khalid Donnel Robison, #4 Summons for Defendant Edward Christopher Sheeran, #5 Summons for Defendant Friends Keep Secrets Inc, #6 Summons for Defendant UMG Recording Inc) (et) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (et) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Steven T Lowe counsel for Plaintiff Konstantine Panagiotis Lois. Adding Steven T. Lowe as counsel of record for Plaintiff Konstantine Panagiotis Lois for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Konstantine Panagiotis Lois, et al.. (Attorney Steven T Lowe added to party Konstantine Panagiotis Lois(pty:pla))(Lowe, Steven) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ryan E Carreon counsel for Plaintiffs Konstantine Panagiotis Lois, Shane Jarret Williams. Adding Ryan E. Carreon as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Konstantine Lois and Shane Williams for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Konstantine Lois and Shane Williams. (Attorney Ryan E Carreon added to party Konstantine Panagiotis Lois(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan E Carreon added to party Shane Jarret Williams(pty:pla))(Carreon, Ryan) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Naomi Manea Sarega counsel for Plaintiffs Konstantine Panagiotis Lois, Shane Jarret Williams. Adding Naomi Manea Sarega as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Konstantine Lois and Shane Williams for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Konstantine Lois and Shane Williams. (Attorney Naomi Manea Sarega added to party Konstantine Panagiotis Lois(pty:pla), Attorney Naomi Manea Sarega added to party Shane Jarret Williams(pty:pla))(Sarega, Naomi) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Konstantine Panagiotis Lois, Shane Jarret Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to Ashley Nicolette Frangipane p/k/a Halsey, #2 Proposed Summons as to Nathan Perez p/k/a Happy Perez, #3 Proposed Summons as to Khalid Donnel Robinson p/k/a Khalid, #4 Proposed Summons as to Edward Christopher Sheeran, #5 Proposed Summons as to Friends Keep Secrets, Inc., #6 Proposed Summons as to UMG Recordings, Inc., d/b/a Interscope Records)(Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Konstantine Panagiotis Lois, Shane Jarret Williams. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Konstantine Panagiotis Lois, Shane Jarret Williams (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Konstantine Panagiotis Lois, Shane Jarret Williams. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31345662 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Shane Jarret Williams, Konstantine Panagiotis Lois. (Attorney Mathew K Higbee added to party Konstantine Panagiotis Lois(pty:pla), Attorney Mathew K Higbee added to party Shane Jarret Williams(pty:pla))(Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UMG Recordings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Naomi Manea Sarega

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven T Lowe

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mathew K Higbee