Koss v. Skullcandy

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Barlow. Plaintiff Koss is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Skullcandy (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-3967569) filed by Koss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1 - A-16 - Non-Limiting Claim Charts, #2 Exhibit B1 - B-16 - Non-Limiting Claim Charts, #3 Exhibit C1 - C16 - Non-Limiting Claim Charts, #4 Exhibit D - Non-Limiting Claim Charts, #5 Exhibit E - Non-Limiting Claim Charts, #6 Exhibit F - '025 Patent, #7 Exhibit G - '155 Patent, #8 Exhibit H - '934 Patent, #9 Exhibit I - '982 Patent, #10 Exhibit J - '325 Patent, #11 Exhibit K - July 10, 2020 Letter, #12 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Barlow (Straight, Samuel) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (mh) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Amended Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (mh) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Darlene F Ghavimi, for Plaintiff Koss (mh) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Benjamin E. Weed, Philip A. Kunz, Erik J. Halverson, Gina E. Johnson, for Plaintiff Koss (mh) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Peter E. Soskin, for Plaintiff Koss (mh) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Skullcandy. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Koss as to Skullcandy served on 4/1/2021, answer due 4/22/2021. (Straight, Samuel) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin J. Weed , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3971014,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Koss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Straight, Samuel) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Philip A. Kunz , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3971019,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Koss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Straight, Samuel) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Peter E. Soskin , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3971057,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Koss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Straight, Samuel) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James A. Shimota , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3971064,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Koss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Straight, Samuel) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Erik J. Halverson , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3971071,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Koss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Straight, Samuel) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gina A. Johnson , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3971075,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Koss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Straight, Samuel) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Darlene F. Ghavimi , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3971421,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Koss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Straight, Samuel) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Benjamin J. Weed for Koss.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 04/07/2021. (jl) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Philip A. Kunz for Koss.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 04/07/2021. (jl) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Peter E. Soskin for Koss.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 04/07/2021. (jl) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James A. Shimota for Koss.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 04/07/2021. (jl) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Erik J. Halverson for Koss.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 04/07/2021. (jl) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Gina A. Johnson for Koss.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 04/07/2021. (jl) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Darlene F. Ghavimi for Koss.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 04/07/2021. (jl) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Defendant's ANSWER to #2 Complaint and, Defendant's COUNTERCLAIM to Plaintiff's Complaint against All Plaintiffs filed by Skullcandy. Attorney J. Jeffrey Gunn added to party Skullcandy(pty:dft)(Gunn, J.) Modified by linking to Complaint on 4/23/2021 (jl). (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Counter Claimant Skullcandy, Defendant Skullcandy identifying MRSK Hold Co as Corporate Parent. (Gunn, J.) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • Docket(#26) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 4/27/2021. (ath) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 05/03/2021. (jl) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Plaintiff Koss Corporation's ANSWER to #24 Counterclaim filed by Koss.(Straight, Samuel) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amanda C. Maxfield , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4006283,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Koss, Counter Defendant Koss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Straight, Samuel) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER granting #29 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Amanda C. Maxfield for Koss,Amanda C. Maxfield for Koss.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 5/14/21. (jrj) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Patent Case Scheduling Order)(Straight, Samuel) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less