Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Plaintiff Koss is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh) (Entered: 09/24/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Skullcandy (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4121109) filed by Koss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '959 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '325 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - '498 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Infringement Letter, #5 Exhibit E - Non-Limiting Claim Charts, #6 Exhibit F - Non-Limiting Claim Charts, #7 Exhibit G - Non-Limiting Claim Charts, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (Straight, Samuel) (Entered: 09/24/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Peter E. Soskin, for Plaintiff Koss. (mh) (Entered: 09/24/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Benjamin E. Weed, Philip A. Kunz, Erik J. Halverson and Gina E. Johnson, for Plaintiff Koss. (mh) (Entered: 09/24/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Darlene F. Ghavimi, for Plaintiff Koss. (mh) (Entered: 09/24/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (mh) (Entered: 09/24/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Skullcandy. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh) (Entered: 09/24/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant within (7) days after the filing of the first answer. Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 1.2, the parties shall hold their conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) no later than thirty-five (35) days after the filing of the first answer to discuss and address those matters found in the form scheduling order located on the court's website. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 09/27/2021. (jl) (Entered: 09/27/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Koss as to Skullcandy served on 9/28/2021, answer due 10/19/2021. (Straight, Samuel) (Entered: 10/01/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Koss filed by Skullcandy. Attorney James C. Watson added to party Skullcandy(pty:dft)(Watson, James) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#11) NOTICE of Defendant's Motion to Consolidate by Skullcandy (Watson, James) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#12) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Koss, Defendant Skullcandy. Form due by 11/3/2021. (alf) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#13) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Skullcandy. (mh) (Entered: 11/02/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#14) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Koss. (alf) (Entered: 11/04/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#15) All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned to the case. (alf) (Entered: 11/04/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#16) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin J. Weed , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4161229,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Koss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Straight, Samuel) (Entered: 11/10/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#17) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Erik J. Halverson , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4161259,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Koss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Straight, Samuel) (Entered: 11/10/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#18) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gina A. Johnson , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4161273,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Koss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Straight, Samuel) (Entered: 11/10/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#19) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Darlene F. Ghavimi , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4161282,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Koss. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order A - Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Straight, Samuel) (Entered: 11/10/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#20) DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr on 11/10/21. (dla) (Entered: 11/10/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#21) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Benjamin J. Weed for Koss. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/11/21. (dla) (Entered: 11/12/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#22) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Erik J. Halverson for Koss. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/11/21. (dla) (Entered: 11/12/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#23) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Gina A. Johnson for Koss. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/11/21. (dla) (Entered: 11/12/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#24) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Darlene F. Ghavimi for Koss. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 11/11/21. (dla) (Entered: 11/12/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#25) Plaintiff Koss Corporation's ANSWER to #10 Counterclaim filed by Koss.(Straight, Samuel) (Entered: 11/12/2021)
[-] Read Less