Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/22/2021 at 05:21:42 (UTC).

KOSS Corporation v. Plantronics, Inc., et. al.

Case Summary

On 05/21/2021 KOSS Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Plantronics, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Laurel Beeler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-03854

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laurel Beeler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Koss Corporation

Counter Claimants and Defendants

Polycom Inc

Plantronics Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Amanda C. Maxfield

Attorney at K&L Gates, LLP

70 W. Madison Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

James A. Shimota

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

70 W. Madison Street, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60602

Gina A. Johnson

Attorney at K&L Gates, LLP

70 W. Madison St., Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Benjamin E Weed

Attorney at KLGates LLP

70 West Madison Street Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Darlene Ghavimi

Attorney at K&L Gates

2801 Via Fortuna, Suite 350

Austin, TX 78746

Philip A. Kunz

Attorney at K&L Gates, LLP

70 W. Madison Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Erik J. Halverson

Attorney at K&L Gates, LLP

70 W. Madison St., Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Peter E. Soskin

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Samantha M. Lerner

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

35 W. Wacker Drive, Ste. 4100

Chicago, IL 60601

Eimeric Reig-Plessis

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

275 Middlefield Road, Suite 205

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Katherine Kelly Vidal

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

275 Middlefield Road, Suite 205

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Katrina Gallagher Eash

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

2121 N. Pearl Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#47

(#47) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2021) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

46 #1

*Restricted*

#46

(#46) Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:20-cv-00663. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 05/21/2021)

#44

(#44) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Darlene Ghavimi on behalf of Amanda Maxfield ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14751470) by on behalf of KOSS Corporation. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#42

(#42) NOTICE of Inter Partes Review Petitions by KOSS Corporation (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

33 #1

Proposed Order

#33

Text Order GRANTING #33 Motion to Stay Case entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendants' Motion to Stay case. After careful consideration of the motion, the Parties briefs, and the applicable law, the Court GRANTS the Motion. All non-venue related proceedings are hereby STAYED pending the Courts resolution of Defendants Motion to Transfer (ECF No. 29). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

1 #10

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

12 #1

Supplemental Standing Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19 Court Procedures

#12

(#12) STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Standing Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19 Court Procedures)(mc5) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

97 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2021) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:20-cv-00663. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Amanda C. Maxfield for KOSS Corporation. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Darlene Ghavimi on behalf of Amanda Maxfield ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14751470) by on behalf of KOSS Corporation. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCase Stayed (lad) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #33 Motion to Stay Case entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendants' Motion to Stay case. After careful consideration of the motion, the Parties briefs, and the applicable law, the Court GRANTS the Motion. All non-venue related proceedings are hereby STAYED pending the Courts resolution of Defendants Motion to Transfer (ECF No. 29). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Sealed Document filed - Opposition Brief. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Opposition Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G) (bw) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #30 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The Motion is GRANTED, and the Clerk 's Office is directed to file the attached documents under seal. If it has not already done so, Koss is ordered to file a redacted version of the sealed civil document within 7 days after the filing of the original sealed document.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE of Inter Partes Review Petitions by KOSS Corporation (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) BRIEF regarding #32 Brief by KOSS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Darlene Ghavimi for Peter E. Soskin ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13787967) by on behalf of KOSS Corporation. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Darlene Ghavimi for Erik Halverson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13787966) by on behalf of KOSS Corporation. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Darlene Ghavimi for Philip A. Kunz ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13787964) by on behalf of KOSS Corporation. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Darlene Ghavimi for Benjamin J. Weed ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13787960) by on behalf of KOSS Corporation. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Parties by KOSS Corporation. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/23/2020) (am). (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by KOSS Corporation. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/23/2020) (am). (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by KOSS Corporation. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/23/2020) (am). (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13787940), filed by KOSS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Ghavimi, Darlene) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/23/2020) (am). (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Standing Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19 Court Procedures)(mc5) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOSS Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Plantronics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eimeric Reig-Plessis