This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2020 at 10:57:15 (UTC).

KOSS Corporation v. Plantronics, Inc., et. al.

Case Summary

On 07/22/2020 KOSS Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Plantronics, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00663

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KOSS Corporation

Defendants

Polycom, Inc.

Plantronics, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Darlene Ghavimi

Attorney at K&L Gates

2801 Via Fortuna, Suite 350

Austin, TX 78746

James A. Shimota

Attorney at K7L Gates, LLP

70 W. Madison St. #3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Gina A Johnson

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

70 W. Madison Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Benjamin J. Weed

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

70 West Madison Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Erik J. Halverson

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

70 W. Madison Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Philip A. Kunz

Attorney at K&L Gates, LLP

70 W. Madison Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Peter E. Soskin

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorneys

Samantha M. Lerner

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

35 W. Wacker Drive, Suite 4100

Chicago, IL 60601

Katherine Kelly Vidal

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

275 Middlefield Road, Suite 205

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Katrina Gallagher Eash

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

2121 N. Pearl Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

21 #1

Proposed Order

#21

(#21) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katrina Gallagher Eash for Eimeric Reig-Plessis ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13981782) by on behalf of Plantronics, Inc., Polycom, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eash, Katrina) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

20 #1

Proposed Order

#20

(#20) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katrina Gallagher Eash for Samantha Lerner ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13981754) by on behalf of Plantronics, Inc., Polycom, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eash, Katrina) (Main Document 20 replaced on 9/18/2020) (am). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/18/2020) (am). (Entered: 09/18/2020)

19 #1

Proposed Order

#19

(#19) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katrina Gallagher Eash for Katherine Vidal ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13981708) by on behalf of Plantronics, Inc., Polycom, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eash, Katrina) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katrina Gallagher Eash on behalf of Plantronics, Inc., Polycom, Inc.. Attorney Katrina Gallagher Eash added to party Plantronics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Katrina Gallagher Eash added to party Polycom, Inc.(pty:dft) (Eash, Katrina) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

17 #1

Proposed Order

#17

(#17) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by KOSS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

1 #10

Exhibit I

1 #9

Exhibit H

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#17) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by KOSS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katrina Gallagher Eash for Eimeric Reig-Plessis ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13981782) by on behalf of Plantronics, Inc., Polycom, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eash, Katrina) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katrina Gallagher Eash for Samantha Lerner ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13981754) by on behalf of Plantronics, Inc., Polycom, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eash, Katrina) (Main Document 20 replaced on 9/18/2020) (am). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/18/2020) (am). (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katrina Gallagher Eash for Katherine Vidal ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13981708) by on behalf of Plantronics, Inc., Polycom, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eash, Katrina) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katrina Gallagher Eash on behalf of Plantronics, Inc., Polycom, Inc.. Attorney Katrina Gallagher Eash added to party Plantronics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Katrina Gallagher Eash added to party Polycom, Inc.(pty:dft) (Eash, Katrina) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Plantronics, Inc. answer due 10/1/2020; Polycom, Inc. answer due 10/1/2020. (am) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion to extend the time for Defendants to Answer. The Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendants shall have up to and including October 1, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by KOSS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Plantronics, Inc.. (am) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Darlene Ghavimi for Peter E. Soskin ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13787967) by on behalf of KOSS Corporation. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Darlene Ghavimi for Erik Halverson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13787966) by on behalf of KOSS Corporation. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Darlene Ghavimi for Philip A. Kunz ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13787964) by on behalf of KOSS Corporation. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Darlene Ghavimi for Benjamin J. Weed ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13787960) by on behalf of KOSS Corporation. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Parties by KOSS Corporation. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/23/2020) (am). (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by KOSS Corporation. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/23/2020) (am). (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by KOSS Corporation. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/23/2020) (am). (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13787940), filed by KOSS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Ghavimi, Darlene) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/23/2020) (am). (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOSS Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Plantronics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Polycom, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samantha M Lerner