This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/20/2020 at 10:56:51 (UTC).

KOSS Corporation v. Bose Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/22/2020 KOSS Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Bose Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00661

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KOSS Corporation

Defendant

Bose Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Darlene Ghavimi

Attorney at K&L Gates

2801 Via Fortuna, Suite 350

Austin, TX 78746

James A. Shimota

Attorney at K7L Gates, LLP

70 W. Madison St. #3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Gina A Johnson

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

70 W. Madison Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Benjamin J. Weed

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

70 West Madison Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Erik J. Halverson

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

70 W. Madison Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Philip A. Kunz

Attorney at K&L Gates, LLP

70 W. Madison Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Peter E. Soskin

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#12

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James A. Shimota for KOSS Corporation. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sm3) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Darlene Ghavimi for James A Shimota ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13861457) by on behalf of KOSS Corporation. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gina A Johnson for KOSS Corporation. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sm3) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Darlene Ghavimi on behalf of Gina A. Johnson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13849126) by on behalf of KOSS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Bose Corporation. (am) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Darlene Ghavimi for Peter E. Soskin ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13787977) by on behalf of KOSS Corporation. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Darlene Ghavimi for Erik Halverson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13787976) by on behalf of KOSS Corporation. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Darlene Ghavimi for Philip A. Kunz ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13787975) by on behalf of KOSS Corporation. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Darlene Ghavimi for Benjamin J. Weed ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13787974) by on behalf of KOSS Corporation. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/23/2020) (am). (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Parties by KOSS Corporation. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by KOSS Corporation. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/23/2020) (am). (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13787912), filed by KOSS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Ghavimi, Darlene) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/23/2020) (am). (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOSS Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where BOSE CORPORATION is a litigant