This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:47:15 (UTC).

Korstanje v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Korstanje filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sean P. Flynn and William F. Jung. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-03003

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sean P. Flynn

Presiding Judge

William F. Jung

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ellen Maria Korstanje

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Interested Party

SSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Martin J. Cohen

Attorney at Michael A. Steinberg & Associates

Suite 195, 4925 Independence Pkwy

Tampa, FL 33634

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/6/2019. (SAO) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS returned executed by Ellen Maria Korstanje. Commissioner of Social Security served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certified return receipt on United States Attorney)(Cohen, Martin) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROOF of service as to Regional Counsel by Ellen Maria Korstanje. (Attachments: #1 Certified Return Receipt on Office of General Counsel)(Cohen, Martin) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROOF of service as to Attorney General by Ellen Maria Korstanje. (Attachments: #1 Certified Return Receipt on the Attorney General)(Cohen, Martin) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (LNR) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Docket(#5) ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/10. (LNR) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ellen Maria Korstanje. Related case(s): no (Cohen, Martin) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/6/2019. (SAO) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-300-T-02SPF. (SJB) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16226141) filed by Ellen Maria Korstanje. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet #2 Proposed Summons Attorney General, #3 Proposed Summons Office of General Counsel, #4 Proposed Summons U.S. Attorney)(Cohen, Martin) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less