This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/14/2022 at 19:50:49 (UTC).

Korn Ferry v. Dominic Andwan

Case Summary

On December 7, 2021, Korn Ferry, formerly known as Korn/Ferry International (“Plaintiff”), represented by Jeffrey Rosenfeld of Blank Rome LLP, filed a contractual lawsuit against Dominic Andwan (“Defendant”), seeking compensatory damages for the Defendant’s alleged breach of two promissory notes. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Central District of California with Judge Dale S. Fischer and Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth presiding.

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Plaintiff entered into two promissory notes with defendant. Plaintiff loaned money to defendant, which defendant agreed to repay, in whole or in part, if his employment ended for certain reasons, including his voluntary resignation, and before certain dates. Defendant voluntarily resigned his employment with plaintiff on February 19, 2021, which became the due date for each note (the “Due Date”). Defendant agreed to pay interest on any amount due and owing on each note, at the rate of 4.00% per annum, starting on the Due Date”.

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “Defendant agreed to pay expenses incurred by plaintiff in enforcing each note, including reasonable attorneys’ fees and costs. Defendant agreed to waive personal service, objections to personal jurisdiction, and objections to venue. Defendant refused to pay any amount due on the notes, despite plaintiff’s demands”.

 

There are two claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff. The first claim deals with alleged breach of contract relating to the March 29, 2019 note. The Plaintiff alleged that on March 29, 2019, Defendant entered into a written promissory note with Plaintiff, in the principal amount of $100,000, for which Defendant received consideration in the form of a sign-on/make-whole bonus. The Plaintiff then alleged that they performed all conditions, covenants, and promises required on its part to be performed in accordance with the terms of the March 29, 2019 Note. The Plaintiff further alleged that the Defendant breached the March 29, 2019 Note by failing to pay $80,000 that was due and owing on the aforementioned due date. Finally, the Plaintiff alleged that as a result of the Defendant's breach, the Plaintiff is entitled to recover $80,000 in compensatory damages. 

 

The second claim alleged deals with breach of contract. The Plaintiff alleged that on July 14, 2020 the Defendant entered into a written promissory note with the Plaintiff, in the principal amount of $150,000, for which the Defendant received consideration in the form of an unearned portion of FY20 bonus. The Plaintiff then alleged that they performed all conditions, covenants, and promises required on its part to be performed in accordance with the terms of the July 14, 2020 note. The Plaintiff further alleged that the Defendant breached the July 14, 2020 note by failing to pay $150,000. 

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the Court for compensatory damages of $230,000, consisting of $80,000 on the March 29, 2019 note and $150,000 on the July 14, 2020 note; interest on $230,000 at 4.00% per annum (which is $25.55 per day), from February 19, 2021, until all amounts due and owing are paid with reasonable attorneys’ fees, according to proof and costs of suit; and any other relief that the Court deems appropriate.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-09470

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale S. Fischer

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Korn Ferry, a Delaware corporation

Korn Ferry

Defendant

DOMINIC ANDWAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey Rosenfeld

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jonathan A Loeb

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Korn Ferry, a Delaware corporation. (Loeb, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Korn Ferry, a Delaware corporation. (Loeb, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Korn Ferry, a Delaware corporation, (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Dominic Andwan. (lh) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Dominic Andwan. (lh) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Korn Ferry, a Delaware corporation, (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Korn Ferry, a Delaware corporation. (Loeb, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Korn Ferry, a Delaware corporation. (Loeb, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32439268 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Korn Ferry, a Delaware corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Jeffrey Rosenfeld added to party Korn Ferry, a Delaware corporation(pty:pla))(Loeb, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KORN/FERRY INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan A Loeb

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey Rosenfeld