This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/28/2023 at 08:06:55 (UTC).

Korbel v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/30/2022 Korbel filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Nannette Jolivette Brown and Janis van Meerveld. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-05576

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nannette Jolivette Brown

Referral Judge

Janis van Meerveld

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Todd M. Korbel

Metairie, LA 70002

Defendant

Scottsdale Insurance Company

Interested Party

Hurricane Ida Program Administrator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Todd M. Korbel

Attorney at Todd M. Korbel, APLC

3045 Ridgelake Dr., Suite 317

Metairie, LA 70002

Defendant Attorneys

Mark Emerson Hanna

Attorney at Mouledoux Bland Legrand & Brackett LLC

701 Poydras Street, Ste 600

New Orleans, LA 70139

Kathryn Lynn Briuglio

Attorney at Mouledoux, Bland, Legrand & Brackett

701 Poydras St., Suite 600

New Orleans, LA 70139

Interested Party Attorney

Francis Joseph Lobrano

Attorney at Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3100

New Orleans, LA 70163

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Partial Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs claims against Defendants Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, National Casualty Company, Scottsdale Indemnity Company, and Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company in the above captioned matter are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' #7 Motion to Dismiss is MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on February 22, 2023. (mp) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) EXPARTE/CONSENT Consent MOTION to Dismiss Party Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, National Casualty Company, Scottsdale Indemnity Company, and Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company, by Todd M. Korbel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Korbel, Todd) Modified text on 2/22/2023 (jls). (Entered: 02/20/2023)

7 #9

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

7 #8

Exhibit F

7 #7

Exhibit E

7 #6

Exhibit D

7 #5

Exhibit C

7 #4

Exhibit B

7 #3

Exhibit A

7 #2

Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts

7 #1

Memorandum in Support

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment by National Casualty Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Scottsdale Indemnity Company, Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Notice of Submission)(Hanna, Mark) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

1 #12

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #11

Verification

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #1

Exhibit A

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Partial Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs claims against Defendants Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, National Casualty Company, Scottsdale Indemnity Company, and Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company in the above captioned matter are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' #7 Motion to Dismiss is MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on February 22, 2023. (mp) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) EXPARTE/CONSENT Consent MOTION to Dismiss Party Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, National Casualty Company, Scottsdale Indemnity Company, and Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company, by Todd M. Korbel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Korbel, Todd) Modified text on 2/22/2023 (jls). (Entered: 02/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Compliance in Response to Court's 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) Directive by National Casualty Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Scottsdale Indemnity Company, Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Hanna, Mark) Modified text on 1/31/2023 (jls). (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Hanna, Mark) Modified text on 1/31/2023 (jls). (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment by National Casualty Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Scottsdale Indemnity Company, Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Notice of Submission)(Hanna, Mark) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Defendants are granted an additional twenty-one days to file responsive pleadings to the petition filed by Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 1/9/2023. (blg) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by National Casualty Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Scottsdale Indemnity Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company, Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.3 Certificate, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Mark Emerson Hanna added to party National Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Emerson Hanna added to party Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Emerson Hanna added to party Scottsdale Indemnity Company(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Emerson Hanna added to party Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Hanna, Mark) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/2022.(js) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company.(js) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (mb) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court Jefferson Parish, case number 832-033 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9724359) filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Notice of Appearance, #9 Certificate of Filing, #10 State Court Notice of Removal, #11 Verification, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Mark Emerson Hanna added to party Scottsdale Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Hanna, Mark) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less