Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2021 at 09:02:52 (UTC).

KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V. v. IDEAVILLAGE PRODUCTS CORP.

Case Summary

On April 8, 2021, Koninklijke Philips N.V. (“Philips” or “Plaintiff”), represented by J. Brugh Lower and William P. Deni, Jr. of Gibbons PC filed an intellectual property lawsuit against IdeaVillage Products Corp. (“Defendant” or “IdeaVillage”), seeking injunctive relief and money damages for allegedly infringing the design patent of grooming product technologies owned by Plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey with Judges Kevin McNulty and Edward S. Kiel presiding. 

 

In its complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that “To protect the unique ornamental appearance of Philips’ shaver design, Philips obtained U.S. Design Patent Nos. D758,661, D788,368, and D776,878, titled “Grooming Apparatus,” “Handle for Grooming Apparatus,” “Shaving Head,” respectively.” Furthermore, “To protect the unique ornamental appearance of Philips’ nose trimmer design, Philips obtained U.S. Design Patent No. D748,859, titled “Nose and Ear Trimmer.”

 

Plaintiff alleged that “Defendant’s accused products infringe the sole claim of U.S. Patent No. D758,661, the sole claim of U.S. Patent No. D788,368, the sole claim of U.S. Patent No. D776,878, the sole claim of U.S. Patent No. D870,972, the sole claim of U.S. Patent No. D905,346 and the sole claim of U.S. Patent No. D748,859 (collectively, the “Asserted Patents”).”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that “To protect the unique ornamental appearance of Philips’ shaver design, Philips obtained U.S. Design Patent Nos. D758,661, D788,368, and D776,878, titled “Grooming Apparatus”, “Handle for Grooming Apparatus”, and “Shaving Head” respectively. The design of the blade further visually distinguishes the OneBlade shaver from other electric shavers in the marketplace.”

 

The Plaintiff even further alleged that “IdeaVillage is a “direct-to-consumer” marketer that promotes consumer products, such as the “As Seen on TV” products. IdeaVillage partners with others, such as “inventor[s], existing compan[ies], or retailer[s],” who have consumer products or brands, and helps them market the consumer products or brands. Specifically, IdeaVillage acquires established brands and invests in “high potential brands at any stage of growth.” IdeaVillage sells men’s grooming products under the MicroTouch brand, including a MicroTouch Solo shaver. In 2020, on information and belief, IdeaVillage began selling its MicroTouch Solo shaver (Second Generation). IdeaVillage’s MicroTouch Solo copies Philips’ patented ornamental designs for a grooming apparatus, handle for a grooming apparatus, and shaver head, specifically D758,661 and D788368.”

 

Plaintiff also alleged that “IdeaVillage also advertises and sells men’s trimmers, including the MicroTouch Max trimmer. On information and belief, IdeaVillage also began advertising the MicroTouch Max Titanium trimmer earlier this year, which is an upgraded version of the MicroTouch Max trimmer and part of MicroTouch Titanium series of men’s grooming products.”

 

There are six claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff. The first claim is for alleged infringement of the D’661 Patent. The second claim is for alleged infringement of the D’368 Patent. The third claim is for alleged infringement of the D’878 Patent. The fourth claim is for alleged infringement of the D’972 Patent. The fifth claim is for alleged infringement of the D’346 Patent. The sixth claim is for alleged infringement of the D’859 Patent.

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the court to adjudicate that the Defendant has infringed the Asserted patents, grant permanent injunction against the infringement of the Defendant, and order an accounting of profits. The Plaintiff further requested the court to award money damages along with costs of litigation.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.




Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-08706

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kevin McNulty

Referral Judge

Edward S. Kiel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V.

Defendant

IDEAVILLAGE PRODUCTS CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

J. BRUGH LOWER

Attorney at GIBBONS PC

One Gateway Center

Newark, NJ 07102

WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.

Attorney at GIBBONS, PC

One Gateway Center

Newark, NJ 07102-5310

JUSTIN TAYLOR QUINN

Attorney at ROBINSON MILLER LLC

110 Edison Place, Suite 302

Newark, NJ 07102

Defendant Attorney

DONALD ANTHONY BESHADA

Attorney at Beshada Farnese LLP

108 Wanaque Ave

Pompton Lakes, NJ 07442

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss . (QUINN, JUSTIN) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

#12

(#12) LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on July 6, 2021 at 2:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found # here. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 6/1/2021. (as, ) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

11 #6

Text of Proposed Order

11 #5

Exhibit 4

11 #4

Exhibit 3

11 #3

Exhibit 2

11 #2

Exhibit 1

11 #1

Brief

#11

(#11) MOTION to Dismiss by IDEAVILLAGE PRODUCTS CORP.. Responses due by 6/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(BESHADA, DONALD) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendant IDEAVILLAGE PRODUCTS CORPORATION to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall have up to, and including, May 28, 2021 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 5/26/2021. (qa, ) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT IDEAVILLAGE PRODUCTS CORPORATION TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by IDEAVILLAGE PRODUCTS CORP.. (BESHADA, DONALD) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#8

(#8) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Ideavillage Products Corp.. Attorney DONALD ANTHONY BESHADA for IDEAVILLAGE PRODUCTS CORP. added. (BESHADA, DONALD) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V.. IDEAVILLAGE PRODUCTS CORP. served on 4/20/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. (QUINN, JUSTIN) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#6

(#6) Substitution of Attorney - Attorney WILLIAM P. DENI, JR and J. BRUGH LOWER terminated. Attorney JUSTIN TAYLOR QUINN for KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V. added.. (QUINN, JUSTIN) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

5 #1

Complaint with Exhibits

#5

(#5) AO120 Patent Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint with Exhibits) (qa, ) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to IDEAVILLAGE PRODUCTS CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, ) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by J. BRUGH LOWER on behalf of KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V. (LOWER, J.) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

22 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResetting Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion reset for 7/6/2021 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Responses due by 6/22/2021 Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (nic, ) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss . (QUINN, JUSTIN) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on July 6, 2021 at 2:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found # here. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 6/1/2021. (as, ) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 6/21/2021 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, ) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Dismiss by IDEAVILLAGE PRODUCTS CORP.. Responses due by 6/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(BESHADA, DONALD) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendant IDEAVILLAGE PRODUCTS CORPORATION to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall have up to, and including, May 28, 2021 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 5/26/2021. (qa, ) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT IDEAVILLAGE PRODUCTS CORPORATION TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by IDEAVILLAGE PRODUCTS CORP.. (BESHADA, DONALD) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk`s Text Order - The document #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by IDEAVILLAGE PRODUCTS CORP. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/25/2021. (qa, ) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Ideavillage Products Corp.. Attorney DONALD ANTHONY BESHADA for IDEAVILLAGE PRODUCTS CORP. added. (BESHADA, DONALD) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V.. IDEAVILLAGE PRODUCTS CORP. served on 4/20/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. (QUINN, JUSTIN) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Substitution of Attorney - Attorney WILLIAM P. DENI, JR and J. BRUGH LOWER terminated. Attorney JUSTIN TAYLOR QUINN for KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V. added.. (QUINN, JUSTIN) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AO120 Patent Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint with Exhibits) (qa, ) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to IDEAVILLAGE PRODUCTS CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, ) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (ak, ) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by J. BRUGH LOWER on behalf of KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V. (LOWER, J.) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V.. (DENI, WILLIAM) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against IDEAVILLAGE PRODUCTS CORP. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12353827) with JURY DEMAND, filed by KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 L. Civ. R. 11.2 Certification)(DENI, WILLIAM) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ideavillage Products Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald A. Beshada Esq.