This case was last updated from PACER on 05/30/2020 at 09:14:54 (UTC).

Komm v. Long

Case Summary

On 03/31/2020 Komm filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Long. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gwynne E. Birzer and Kathryn H. Vratil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02166

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gwynne E. Birzer

Presiding Judge

Kathryn H. Vratil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michelle Komm

Defendant

Alec Long

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chad A. Stewart

Attorney at Edelman & Thompson, LLC

3100 Broadway, Suite 1400

Kansas City, MO 64111

Defendant Attorneys

David R. Buchanan

Attorney at Brown & James, PC - KC

2345 Grand Boulevard, Suite 2100

Kansas City, MO 64108

Jared Michael Becker, I

Attorney at Brown & James, P.C.

2345 Grand Boulevard, Ste 2100

Kansas City, MO 64108

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) PHASE I SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant file Joint Mediation Notice by 9/25/2020. Mediation Discovery deadline 10/2/2020. Mediation deadline 10/16/2020. Jury Trial set for 11/16/2021 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 440 before District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 5/27/2020. (rel) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

11 #1

Exhibit A

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of all notices and filings with Johnson County by Alec Long. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Buchanan, David) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Michelle Komm (Stewart, Chad) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) by Alec Long. (Buchanan, David) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Alec Long. (Buchanan, David) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#7

(#7) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 5/27/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 5/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 4/3/20. (ala) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to the State Court Petition by Alec Long. (Originally filed in the Johnson County District Court on 3/16/2020.) (mam) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF SERVICE by Alec Long of all notices and filings with Johnson County (Buchanan, David) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

#4

(#4) STATE COURT RECORDS from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas. (Buchanan, David) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alec Long identifying None as corporate parent . (Buchanan, David) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Alec Long. (Buchanan, David) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas; case number 20CV01009; trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5104039.), filed by Alec Long. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Buchanan, David) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PHASE I SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant file Joint Mediation Notice by 9/25/2020. Mediation Discovery deadline 10/2/2020. Mediation deadline 10/16/2020. Jury Trial set for 11/16/2021 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 440 before District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 5/27/2020. (rel) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 5/27/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (rel) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of all notices and filings with Johnson County by Alec Long. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Buchanan, David) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Michelle Komm (Stewart, Chad) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) by Alec Long. (Buchanan, David) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Alec Long. (Buchanan, David) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 5/27/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 5/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 4/3/20. (ala) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to the State Court Petition by Alec Long. (Originally filed in the Johnson County District Court on 3/16/2020.) (mam) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF SERVICE by Alec Long of all notices and filings with Johnson County (Buchanan, David) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATE COURT RECORDS from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas. (Buchanan, David) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alec Long identifying None as corporate parent . (Buchanan, David) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Alec Long. (Buchanan, David) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas; case number 20CV01009; trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5104039.), filed by Alec Long. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Buchanan, David) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less