This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/10/2019 at 07:22:48 (UTC).

Kolstad Company, Inc. v. Great Dane LP

Case Summary

On 07/12/2019 Kolstad Company, Inc filed a Contract - Franchise lawsuit against Great Dane LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven E. Rau and Patrick J. Schiltz. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-01830

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Franchise

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Steven E. Rau

Presiding Judge

Patrick J. Schiltz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kolstad Company, Inc.

Defendant

Great Dane LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark L. Johnson

Attorney at Greene Espel PLLP

222 S 9Th St Ste 2200

Mpls, MN 55402

Holley C Horrell

Attorney at Greene Espel PLLP

222 S 9Th St., Ste 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kolstad Company, Inc. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

#18

(#18) LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Kolstad Company, Inc. regarding deadlines. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#17

(#17) LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kolstad Company, Inc. re: extension of deadline to answer complaint. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#16

(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kolstad Company, Inc. Great Dane LP served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Johnson, Mark) Modified text on 7/24/2019 (MMP) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

15 #1

Affidavit of Service

#15

(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kolstad Company, Inc.. Great Dane LP served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#14

(#14) AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested : Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Johnson, Mark) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (MMP). (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#12

(#12) LETTER to Request Scheduling of a Hearing on #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested . (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

8 #6

Exhibit(s) F

8 #5

Exhibit(s) E

7 #1

LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Kolstad Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested : Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#5

(#11) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Kolstad Company, Inc..(Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Great Dane LP. (MMG) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Kolstad Company, Inc.. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Great Dane LP (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6992749) filed by Kolstad Company, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kolstad Company, Inc. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) (Text-only) ORDER in Response to #17 Letter to Magistrate Judge. Defendant Great Dane LPs deadline to respond to the Complaint in this matter is hereby extended to August 12, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 8/12/2019. (MME) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Kolstad Company, Inc. regarding deadlines. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kolstad Company, Inc. re: extension of deadline to answer complaint. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kolstad Company, Inc. Great Dane LP served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Johnson, Mark) Modified text on 7/24/2019 (MMP) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kolstad Company, Inc.. Great Dane LP served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested : Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Johnson, Mark) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (MMP). (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) TEXT ONLY ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested : Motion Hearing RESCHEDULED for 8/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. Defendant's response brief due no later than August 7, 2019. Plaintiff's reply brief due no later than August 14, 2019. Plaintiff is directed to file and serve an amended notice of hearing on motion. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 7/15/2019. (ECW) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) LETTER to Request Scheduling of a Hearing on #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested . (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Kolstad Company, Inc..(Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kolstad Company, Inc..(Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Declaration of Robert Crosson in Support of #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Kolstad Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E)(Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Declaration of Holley C. Horrell in Support of #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Kolstad Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F)(Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Kolstad Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested : Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Kolstad Company, Inc.. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Great Dane LP. (MMG) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • (#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-1830 PJS/SER. (MMG) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (MMG). (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Kolstad Company, Inc.. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Great Dane LP (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6992749) filed by Kolstad Company, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Great Dane LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Holley C Horrell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark L. Johnson