This case was last updated from PACER on 05/31/2020 at 08:31:05 (UTC).

KOLCUN v. ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR

Case Summary

On 04/01/2020 KOLCUN filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert J. Colville. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00439

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Colville

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRISTOPHER KOLCUN

Defendants

ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR

ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sean L. Ruppert

Attorney at RUPPERT MANES NARAHARI

600 Grant St, 49Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHRISTOPHER KOLCUN. ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, LLC waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020. (Ruppert, Sean) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

6 #2

Exhibit

6 #1

Exhibit

#6

(#6) Errata re #5 Amended Complaint by CHRISTOPHER KOLCUN. Reason for Correction: Filed the incorrect amended complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Ruppert, Sean) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

5 #2

Exhibit

5 #1

Exhibit

#5

(#5) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR, filed by CHRISTOPHER KOLCUN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Ruppert, Sean) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 4/1/20. (jg) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5530181), filed by CHRISTOPHER KOLCUN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (jd) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2020
  • DocketFINAL NOTICE: In preparation of the Court's conversion to NextGen, our Court's CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on Friday, May 22, 2020, until 11:59 pm. Monday, May 25, 2020. Please plan accordingly. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. The second step is to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains any special characters (anything other than a letter or number), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020. Please consult the Court's #administrative order for additional information on deadlines and alternative filing options during this period. (Administrator, ) (ADI) (Entered: 05/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHRISTOPHER KOLCUN. ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, LLC waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020. (Ruppert, Sean) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF on May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account in order to electronically file after our conversion to NextGen. The second step will be to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains a special character (such as &, @, $, *), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to (1) review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020 and (2) ensure that your primary email address to receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEF) is accurate. Failure to provide an accurate email address may result in a delay in receiving NEFs after the Court converts to NextGen. (Administrator, ) (ADI) (Entered: 04/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Errata re #5 Amended Complaint by CHRISTOPHER KOLCUN. Reason for Correction: Filed the incorrect amended complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Ruppert, Sean) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR, filed by CHRISTOPHER KOLCUN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Ruppert, Sean) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jg) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 4/1/20. (jg) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5530181), filed by CHRISTOPHER KOLCUN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (jd) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less