This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/16/2023 at 16:19:09 (UTC).

KOHRHERR v. CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/15/2022 KOHRHERR filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Christine P. O'Hearn and Sharon A. King. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02208

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christine P. O'Hearn

Referral Judge

Sharon A. King

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOUGLAS KOHRHERR

Defendant

CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEW D. MILLER

Defendant Attorney

CHRISTINA MAE MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Certification of Electronic Filing and Service

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC. (MICHAEL, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#3

Clerk`s Text Order - The #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/6/2022. (amv) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#4

(#4) STIPULATION and Consent Order Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Reply to the Complaint by CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC. (MICHAEL, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE REPLY TO THE COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 5/9/2022. (amv) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#6

No Description Available

#7

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/14/2022 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2022. Pretrial factual Discovery due by 10/12/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 1/17/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 6/15/2022. (amv (Entered: 06/16/2022)

#13

(#13) Proposed Order (Discovery Confidentiality Order) by CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC. (MICHAEL, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#14

(#14) Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 7/8/202. (amv) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#17

(#17) STIPULATION of Dismissal by CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC. (MICHAEL, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

#18

(#18) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC. (MICHAEL, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/27/2022

Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (See document #18) (bf, ) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the Consent Order of Dismissal attached to docket entry #17 appears to have been filed erroneously. Please refer to docket entry #18 for the corrected entry. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (amv) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC. (MICHAEL, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) STIPULATION of Dismissal by CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC. (MICHAEL, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2022

Docket(#16) TEXT ORDER: The Court having held a telephone status conference on September 22, 2022; it is hereby ORDERED that a follow-up telephone status conference is scheduled for October 12, 2022 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-888-278-0296, Access Code 2961061#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 9/22/22. (mb, ) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2022

Docket(#15) TEXT ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict the telephone status conference scheduled for September 14, 2022 at 11:30 am is being RESCHEDULED to September 22, 2022 at 11:30 am. All parties shall dial 1-888-278-0296 Access Code 2961061# to connect to the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 7/19/22. (mb, ) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 7/8/202. (amv) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Proposed Order (Discovery Confidentiality Order) by CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC. (MICHAEL, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/14/2022 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2022. Pretrial factual Discovery due by 10/12/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 1/17/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 6/15/2022. (amv (Entered: 06/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2022

DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/14/2022 by telephone. Scheduling Order to be entered (mb, ) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
05/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE REPLY TO THE COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 5/9/2022. (amv) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) STIPULATION and Consent Order Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Reply to the Complaint by CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC. (MICHAEL, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketClerk`s Text Order - The #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/6/2022. (amv) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC.. (MICHAEL, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC. (MICHAEL, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2022

DocketOrder in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, within 30 days of the filing of a Notice of Removal, or where the Complaint is initially filed in this Court, 30 days after an answer, other responsive pleading, or motion has been filed. Signed by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 4/19/2022. (jab) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2022

DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (jab) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2022

DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Attorney Information,Cause of Action,Nature of Suit, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jab) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2022

DocketJudge Christine P. O'Hearn and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (mmb, ) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC from Superior Court of Salem County, case number SLM-L-000019-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13339480), filed by CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certification of Electronic Filing and Service)(MICHAEL, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less