This case was last updated from PACER on 05/16/2020 at 11:19:19 (UTC).

Kohli v. Dayal et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2020 Kohli filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Dayal. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cam Ferenbach and Gloria M. Navarro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00538

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cam Ferenbach

Presiding Judge

Gloria M. Navarro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric Kohli

Las Vegas, NV 89107

Defendants

Quantified Investment Group LLC

Quantified Capital Group, LLC

Ajay G Dayal

Miss Elegant Expo

Pacific Bay Lending Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Brandon Phillips

Attorney at Brandon L. Phillips, Attorney at Law, PLLC

1455 E. Tropicana Avenue, Ste. 750

Las Vegas, NV 89119

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) REPLY to Response to #15 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Ajay G Dayal, Miss Elegant Expo, Pacific Bay Lending Group, Quantified Capital Group, LLC, Quantified Investment Group LLC. (Phillips, Brandon) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

20 #1

Certificate of Service Cert of Service

#20

(#20) RESPONSE to #15 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. Replies due by 5/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Cert of Service) (Kohli, Eric) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

18 #1

Certificate of Service Cert of Service for Opposition

#18

(#18) ERROR: Incorrect event used. Plaintiff advised to refile. NON-OPPOSITION to #15 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Cert of Service for Opposition) (Kohli, Eric) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

17 #2

Certificate of Service Cert of Service

17 #1

Exhibit Exhibits for Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint

#17

(#17) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Eric Kohli. No changes to parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits for Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #2 Certificate of Service Cert of Service) (Kohli, Eric) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#15

(#15) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Ajay G Dayal. Responses due by 5/13/2020. (Phillips, Brandon) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed re #1 Complaint. Pacific Bay Lending Group served on 3/17/2020. (ADR) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

#7

(#9) ORDER Granting #7 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. On or before 4/6/20, Plaintiff must provide certification that he has completed the CM/ECF tutorial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed re #1 Complaint. Ajay G Dayal served on 3/17/2020; Miss Elegant Expo served on 3/17/2020; Quantified Capital Group, LLC served on 3/17/2020; Quantified Investment Group LLC served on 3/17/2020. (ADR) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

#4

(#4) ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (ADR) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (ADR) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Eric Kohli. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (ADR) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

1 #2

Receipt no. NVLAS069266

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#14) MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 4/15/2020 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Crtrm Administrator: T. Renfro; Pla Counsel: Eric Kohli, Pro Se; Def Counsel: Brandon Phillips; Recording start and end times: 10:03 - 10:13 a.m.; Courtroom: 3D; All parties appeared telephonically. The Court makes preliminary remarks and admonishes Mr. Phillips for joining the telephonic conference late. ORDERED that #11 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED in Part and DENIED in Part. Defendants have until 4/29/2020 to Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REPLY to Response to #15 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Ajay G Dayal, Miss Elegant Expo, Pacific Bay Lending Group, Quantified Capital Group, LLC, Quantified Investment Group LLC. (Phillips, Brandon) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE to #15 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. Replies due by 5/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Cert of Service) (Kohli, Eric) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CLERK'S NOTICE. Action Required to ECF No. #18 Non-Opposition. Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected. Plaintiff is advised to refile ECF No. #18 using the appropriate docket entry event, "Response," and correctly following the prompts. (no image attached) (EDS) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ERROR: Incorrect event used. Plaintiff advised to refile. NON-OPPOSITION to #15 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Cert of Service for Opposition) (Kohli, Eric) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Eric Kohli. No changes to parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits for Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #2 Certificate of Service Cert of Service) (Kohli, Eric) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/30/2020. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #15 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Ajay G Dayal. Responses due by 5/13/2020. (Phillips, Brandon) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 4/15/2020 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Crtrm Administrator: T. Renfro; Pla Counsel: Eric Kohli, Pro Se; Def Counsel: Brandon Phillips; Recording start and end times: 10:03 - 10:13 a.m.; Courtroom: 3D; All parties appeared telephonically. The Court makes preliminary remarks and admonishes Mr. Phillips for joining the telephonic conference late. ORDERED that #11 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED in Part and DENIED in Part. Defendants have until 4/29/2020 to Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/9/2020. Before the Court is Defendants Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. 11) and Plaintiffs Opposition (ECF No. 12). Accordingly,IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a telephonic hearing on Defendants Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. 11) is scheduled for 10:00 AM, April 15, 2020.The call-in telephone number is (888)273-3658, access code: 3912597. The call must be made five minutes prior to the hearing time. The court will join the call and convene the proceedings. To improve sound quality, the parties should use a land line, at all possible. The use of a speaker phone during the proceedings is prohibited.The Public may access and listen to the hearing using the telephone number and access code as provided above. The public may not speak during the hearing and must put their phone on mute. The public may not record the hearing. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MT) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE to #11 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. Replies due by 4/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit) (Kohli, Eric) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Granting #7 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. On or before 4/6/20, Plaintiff must provide certification that he has completed the CM/ECF tutorial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed re #1 Complaint. Pacific Bay Lending Group served on 3/17/2020. (ADR) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically, filed by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. (ADR) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed re #1 Complaint. Ajay G Dayal served on 3/17/2020; Miss Elegant Expo served on 3/17/2020; Quantified Capital Group, LLC served on 3/17/2020; Quantified Investment Group LLC served on 3/17/2020. (ADR) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (ADR) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (ADR) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Eric Kohli. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (ADR) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400), filed by Eric Kohli. Proof of service due by 6/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt no. NVLAS069266) (ADR) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (RT) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less