This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:17:56 (UTC).

Kohen v. Lenox Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Kohen filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Lenox Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is William G. Young. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-12462

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William G. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph S. Kohen

Defendant

Lenox Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen S. Churchill

Attorney at Fair Work, P.C.

192 South Street, Suite 450

Boston, MA 02111

Defendant Attorneys

Katharine O. Beattie

Attorney at Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo, PC

One Financial Center, 42Nd Flr.

Boston, MA 02111

Emma N. Follansbee

Attorney at Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo, PC

One Financial Center, 42Nd Flr.

Boston, MA 02111

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Lenox Corporation.(Beattie, Katharine) (Modified on 1/31/2020 to Correct CM/ECF Filing Event) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lenox Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Lenox Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for Lenox Corporation.. (Beattie, Katharine) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Emma N. Follansbee on behalf of Lenox Corporation (Follansbee, Emma) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Katharine O. Beattie on behalf of Lenox Corporation (Beattie, Katharine) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#4

(#4) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Joseph S. Kohen. Lenox Corporation served on 1/15/2020, answer due 2/5/2020. Acknowledgment filed by Joseph S. Kohen. (Churchill, Stephen) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Lenox Corporation. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Category Form

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Consent to Sue

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Lenox Corporation Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7999633 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Joseph S. Kohen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent to Sue, #2 Category Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Churchill, Stephen) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Lenox Corporation.(Beattie, Katharine) (Modified on 1/31/2020 to Correct CM/ECF Filing Event) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lenox Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Lenox Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for Lenox Corporation.. (Beattie, Katharine) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Emma N. Follansbee on behalf of Lenox Corporation (Follansbee, Emma) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Katharine O. Beattie on behalf of Lenox Corporation (Beattie, Katharine) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Joseph S. Kohen. Lenox Corporation served on 1/15/2020, answer due 2/5/2020. Acknowledgment filed by Joseph S. Kohen. (Churchill, Stephen) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Lenox Corporation. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Lenox Corporation Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7999633 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Joseph S. Kohen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent to Sue, #2 Category Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Churchill, Stephen) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.