This case was last updated from PACER on 10/03/2021 at 07:39:35 (UTC).

Koeut v. Navient Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 Koeut filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Navient Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony J. Battaglia and Allison H. Goddard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01398

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anthony J. Battaglia

Referral Judge

Allison H. Goddard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Seth Koeut

Defendants

Navient Corporation

Navient Solutions, LLC

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ahren A. Tiller

Attorney at BLC Law Center, APC

1230 Columbia Street, Suite 1100

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Nona Yegazarian

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard, Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Thomas P Quinn, Jr

Attorney at Nokes and Quinn

410 Broadway, Suite 200

Laguna Beach, CA 92651

Matthew R. Fox

Attorney at Jones Day

4655 Executive Drive

San Diego, CA 92121

 

Court Documents

#13

12 #2

Table of Contents of Exhibits

12 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities

12 #12

Main Document

#11

#9

#8

#7

6 #1

Proof of Service

6 #6

Main Document

5 #1

Proof of Service

5 #5

Main Document

4 #1

Declaration of Nona Yegazarian

4 #4

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: finding as moot #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (no document attached) (sc) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #12 Joint MOTION to Dismiss : Responses due by 9/27/2021; Replies due by 10/4/2021; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(no document attached) (sc) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Navient Corporation, Navient Solutions, LLC . Identifying Other Affiliate Navient Solutions, LLC for Navient Corporation, Navient Solutions, LLC. (Yegazarian, Nona) (jrm). (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Navient Corporation, Navient Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Table of Contents of Exhibits)(Yegazarian, Nona) (jrm). (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 10/29/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2021 09:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 8/27/21.(dlg) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to Complaint. Answer due by 9/10/2021. (no document attached) (sc) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting Joint #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/27/21. (dlg) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Quinn, Thomas)(jrm). (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Equifax Information Services, LLC re #3 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC . (Quinn, Thomas)(jrm). (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent EXPERIAN PLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate OPT-OUT SERVICES LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fox, Matthew) (dlg). (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fox, Matthew)Attorney Matthew R. Fox added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg). (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Navient Corporation, Navient Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nona Yegazarian)(Yegazarian, Nona)Attorney Nona Yegazarian added to party Navient Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Nona Yegazarian added to party Navient Solutions, LLC(pty:dft) (dlg). (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Quinn, Thomas)Attorney Thomas P Quinn, Jr added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft) QC email, document not signed by all parties. Attorney should withdraw (dlg). (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (sjt). (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Navient Corporation, Navient Solutions, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15999023.), filed by Seth Koeut. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1398-AJB-AHG. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Tiller, Ahren)(smd) (sjt). (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Navient Solutions, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Navient is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant