This case was last updated from PACER on 09/18/2020 at 10:34:01 (UTC).

Koeppel Clark LLC, et al v. Starr Indemnity & Liability Company

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 Koeppel Clark LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Starr Indemnity Liability Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Janis van Meerveld and Greg Gerard Guidry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02055

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Janis van Meerveld

Presiding Judge

Greg Gerard Guidry

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Beko Properties, LLC

Koeppel Clark LLC

Defendant

Starr Indemnity & Liability Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Scarth Clark

Attorney at Koeppel Clark Turner

2030 St. Charles Ave.

New Orleans, LA 70130

Peter Stephan Koeppel

Attorney at Koeppel Traylor,LLC

2030 St. Charles Ave.

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas H. Prince

Attorney at Chaffe McCall LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 2300

New Orleans, LA 70163-2300

Charles D. Marshall, III

Attorney at Chaffe McCall LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 2300

New Orleans, LA 70163-2300

Leah Nunn Engelhardt

Attorney at Chaffe McCall LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 2300

New Orleans, LA 70163-2300

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Starr Indemnity & Liability Company answer due 9/28/2020. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 09/16/2020. (ko) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

6 #2

Proposed Order

6 #1

Exhibit 1

#6

(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings re #1 Complaint by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) Attorney Leah Nunn Engelhardt added to party Starr Indemnity & Liability Company(pty:dft).(Engelhardt, Leah) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Starr Indemnity & Liability Company served on 7/25/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Clark, William) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (mm) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

1 #4

Waiver of Service of Summons

1 #3

Notice of Lawsuit

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Starr Indemnity & Liability Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8409638) filed by Koeppel Clark LLC, Beko Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Notice of Lawsuit, #4 Waiver of Service of Summons) Attorney William Scarth Clark added to party Beko Properties, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney William Scarth Clark added to party Koeppel Clark LLC(pty:pla).(Clark, William) (Attachment 4 replaced on 7/21/2020) (mm). (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/21/2020) (mm). (Entered: 07/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Starr Indemnity & Liability Company answer due 9/28/2020. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 09/16/2020. (ko) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings re #1 Complaint by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) Attorney Leah Nunn Engelhardt added to party Starr Indemnity & Liability Company(pty:dft).(Engelhardt, Leah) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Starr Indemnity & Liability Company served on 7/25/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Clark, William) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. 1. Attorney submitted a complaint with et al in the caption. Clerk requested corrected complaint. Clerk has replaced original complaint with new complaint provided. 2. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of attachment 4. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (mm) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (mm) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Starr Indemnity & Liability Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8409638) filed by Koeppel Clark LLC, Beko Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Notice of Lawsuit, #4 Waiver of Service of Summons) Attorney William Scarth Clark added to party Beko Properties, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney William Scarth Clark added to party Koeppel Clark LLC(pty:pla).(Clark, William) (Attachment 4 replaced on 7/21/2020) (mm). (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/21/2020) (mm). (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less