This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/05/2019 at 07:47:39 (UTC).

Koenig v. Newsom et al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2019 Koenig filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against Newsom. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Morrison C. England, Jr and Deborah Barnes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01507

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Morrison C. England, Jr

Referral Judge

Deborah Barnes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeffrey S. Koenig

Defendants

Alex Padilla

Gavin Christopher Newsom

Not Classified By Court

Jerry Griffin

Melissa Melendez

Donald J. Trump

Donald J. Trump for President, Inc.

The Republican National Committee

The California Republican Party

Charles McDougald

Bilal Ali Essayli

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark Anchor Albert

Attorney at Mark Anchor Albert And Associates

800 W. 6Th Street, Suite 1220

Los Angeles, CA 90027

Defendant Attorneys

Peter H. Chang

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

Chad A. Stegeman

Attorney at California Department of Justice

455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Robert Patrick Sticht

Attorney at Judicial Watch, Inc.

425 Third Street Sw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20024

Harmeet Kaur Dhillon

Attorney at Dhillon Law Group, Inc.

177 Post Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94108

Bryan Kipp Weir

Attorney at Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

1600 Wilson Blvd., Suite 700

Arlington, VA 22209

 

Court Documents

#37

#36

#35

RESTRICTED

#33

32 #1

Proposed Order

#30

11 #2

Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Jeffrey S. Koenig's Motion

11 #1

Memorandum Brief in support of Plaintiff Jeffrey S. Koenig's Motion for Pre

#11

6 #3

VDRP

6 #2

Consent Form

6 #1

Standing Order

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) AMENDED MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/2/2019 GRANTING #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants are hereby ENJOINED from enforcing the provisions of the Presidential Tax Transparency and Accountability Act to the extent they require candidates for the presidency to disclose their tax returns as a condition of appearing on California's presidential primary ballot. (Donati, J) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/1/2019 GRANTING #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants are hereby ENJOINED from enforcing the provisions of the Presidential Tax Transparency and Accountability Act to the extent they require candidates for the presidency to disclose their tax returns as a condition of appearing on Californias presidential primary ballot. (Donati, J) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 19, 2019, before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr, filed by Court Reporter Diane Shepard, Phone number 916-554-7460 E-mail diane.shepard@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 10/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/26/2019. (Shepard, D) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.: MOTION HEARING held on 9/19/2019. After argument from counsel, the Court tentatively GRANTED the Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #11 . A written order will be filed not later than October 1, 2019. Plaintiff's Counsel Mark Albert, present and appeared telephonically. Defendants' Counsel Jay Russell, Chad Stegeman, Peter Chang, and Paul Stein, present. Court Reporter: Diane Shepard. (Deutsch, S) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/18/19 GRANTING Mr. Albert' s request to appear and argue at the hearing on the related preliminary injunction motions telephonically.(Becknal, R) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the 9/19/2019 Motions for Preliminary Injunction hearing re #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jeffrey S. Koenig, #30 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Jeffrey S. Koenig, #28 Opposition to Motion filed by Alex Padilla, Gavin Christopher Newsom by Jeffrey S. Koenig. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Albert, Mark) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Docket(#31) MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to this Court's previous Related Case Orders, civil cases 2:19-cv-1477-MCE-DB, 2:19-cv-01501-MCE-DB, 2:19-cv-01506-MCE-DB, 2:19-cv-01507-MCE-DB and 2:19-cv-01659-MCE-DB are hereby RELATED. (Deutsch, S) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) REPLY by Jeffrey S. Koenig in SUPPORT of #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Albert, Mark) Modified on 9/13/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion, the September 19, 2019 hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #11 is ADVANCED to 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 7. (Deutsch, S) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) OPPOSITION by Gavin Christopher Newsom, Alex Padilla to #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Chang, Peter) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Jeffrey S. Koenig on 8/9/2019, Answer due 10/8/2019 (Albert, Mark) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Donati, J) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/9/2019 ORDERING that cases 2:19-cv-1477, 2:19-cv-1501, 2:19-cv-1506 and 2:19-cv-1507 are RELATED. All cases shall be ASSIGNED to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan are no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 2:19-cv-1507 MCE DB. All dates currently set are hereby VACATED.(Donati, J) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:19-cv-01477-MCE-DB, 2:19-cv-01501-TLN-AC, 2:19-cv-01506-WBS-CKD by Jerry Griffin.(Sticht, Robert) Modified on 8/7/2019 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Coll, A) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Gavin Christopher Newsom, Alex Padilla* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mark Anchor Albert* *800 W. 6th Street* *Suite 1220* *Los Angeles, CA 90027*. (Coll, A) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) [DISREGARD - SEE #7 NOTICE] NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:19-cv-01477-JAM-DB, 2:19-cv-01501-TLN-AC, 2:19-at-00706 by Jerry Griffin. Attorney Sticht, Robert Patrick added. (Sticht, Robert) Modified on 8/7/2019 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:19-cv-01477-JAM-DB, 2:19-at-00706, 2:19-at-00705, 2:19-cv-01501-TLN-AC by Jeffrey S. Koenig. (Albert, Mark) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jeffrey S. Koenig (Albert, Mark) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jeffrey S. Koenig. Attorney Albert, Mark Anchor added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8394385) (Albert, Mark) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The California Republican Party is a litigant

Latest cases where Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chad A. Stegeman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter H. Chang