This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2021 at 05:22:07 (UTC).

Koch v. Marquette et al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 Koch filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Marquette. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gordon P. Gallagher and Lewis T. Babcock. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00781

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gordon P. Gallagher

Presiding Judge

Lewis T. Babcock

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Koch

Florence, CO 81226-8500

Defendants

Marquette

True

BOP

Heise

Dell

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/7/2021, re #5 Amended Complaint filed by Michael Koch. (sphil, ) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#13

(#13) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/14/2021, re: #11 Motion to Continue. ORDERED Plaintiff shall file an amended pleading as directed in the April 9, 2021 Order Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Prisoner Complaint (ECF No. 9), on or before, June 28, 2021. Failure to comply may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice.(sphil, ) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER OF REFERENCE to the United States Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/14/2021. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, and D.C.COLO.LCivR 72.1, United States Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-00781-LTB-GPG. (sphil, ) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Continue by Plaintiff Michael Koch. (sphil, ) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

#10

(#10) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/13/2021. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1, the Clerk of Court is directed to assign thismatter to Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. The undersigned will remain as the assigned magistrate judge. (sphil, ) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Prisoner Complaint. If Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Prisoner Complaint that complies with this Order within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to mail to Plaintiff, with a copy of this Order, one blank Prisoner Complaint form, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/9/2021. (forms and order mailed as instructed). (sphil, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/9/2021, re: #4 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. sec 1915 is GRANTED. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order to FLM/Legal Svcs~@bop.gov. (order emailed to FLM Legal as instructed)..(sphil, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#7

(#7) Prisoner Account STATEMENT re #6 MOTION for Order to by Plaintiff Michael Koch. (sphil, ) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiff Michael Koch. (sphil, ) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT against BOP, Dell, Heise, Marquette, True, filed by Michael Koch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(sphil, ) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#4

(#4) Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Michael Koch. (sphil, ) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to mail to Plaintiff, with a copy of this order, one blank copy of the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and Prisoner Complaint forms, along with the applicable instructions, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/17/2021. (forms mailed as ordered). (sphil, ) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (Jurisdiction) against BOP, Dell, Heise, Marquette, True, filed by Michael Koch. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jsalz, ) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/7/2021, re #5 Amended Complaint filed by Michael Koch. (sphil, ) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/14/2021, re: #11 Motion to Continue. ORDERED Plaintiff shall file an amended pleading as directed in the April 9, 2021 Order Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Prisoner Complaint (ECF No. 9), on or before, June 28, 2021. Failure to comply may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice.(sphil, ) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER OF REFERENCE to the United States Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/14/2021. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, and D.C.COLO.LCivR 72.1, United States Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-00781-LTB-GPG. (sphil, ) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Continue by Plaintiff Michael Koch. (sphil, ) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/13/2021. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1, the Clerk of Court is directed to assign thismatter to Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. The undersigned will remain as the assigned magistrate judge. (sphil, ) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Prisoner Complaint. If Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Prisoner Complaint that complies with this Order within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to mail to Plaintiff, with a copy of this Order, one blank Prisoner Complaint form, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/9/2021. (forms and order mailed as instructed). (sphil, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/9/2021, re: #4 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. sec 1915 is GRANTED. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order to FLM/Legal Svcs~@bop.gov. (order emailed to FLM Legal as instructed)..(sphil, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Prisoner Account STATEMENT re #6 MOTION for Order to by Plaintiff Michael Koch. (sphil, ) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiff Michael Koch. (sphil, ) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT against BOP, Dell, Heise, Marquette, True, filed by Michael Koch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(sphil, ) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Michael Koch. (sphil, ) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to mail to Plaintiff, with a copy of this order, one blank copy of the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and Prisoner Complaint forms, along with the applicable instructions, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/17/2021. (forms mailed as ordered). (sphil, ) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, ) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (Jurisdiction) against BOP, Dell, Heise, Marquette, True, filed by Michael Koch. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jsalz, ) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where True is a litigant

Latest cases where BOP is a litigant

Latest cases where Dell Inc. is a litigant