This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:32:05 (UTC).

Kobs v. Paul Davis Restoration of Greater St. Paul, MN

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Kobs filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Paul Davis Restoration of Greater St Paul, MN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are John R. Tunheim and Katherine M. Menendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-03033

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Tunheim

Referral Judge

Katherine M. Menendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mitchell Kobs

Defendant

Paul Davis Restoration of Greater St. Paul, MN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian T Rochel

Attorney at Teske, Katz, Kitzer & Rochel, PLLP

222 S 9Th St, Ste 4050

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Abou Amara, Jr

Attorney at Teske Katz Kitzer Rochel

222 S. 9Th St, Ste 4050

Minneapolis, MN 55404

Phillip M Kitzer

Attorney at Teske, Katz, Kitzer & Rochel, PLLP

222 South 9Th Street, Ste. 4050

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant Attorneys

Monica Detert

Attorney at Larson King, lLP

30 E. 7Th Street, Suite 2800

St. Paul, MN 55101

Angela Beranek Brandt

Attorney at Larson King, LLP

30 E 7Th St Ste 2800

St Paul, MN 55101-4922

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Paul Davis Restoration of Greater St. Paul, MN (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7318320) filed by Mitchell Thomas Kobs. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kitzer, Phillip) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

5 #1

Consent Form

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Paul Davis Restoration of Greater St. Paul, MN. (Brandt, Angela) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 12/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(BJP) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Paul Davis Restoration of Greater St. Paul, MN. (CLK) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 12/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(BJP) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Paul Davis Restoration of Greater St. Paul, MN. (Brandt, Angela) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Paul Davis Restoration of Greater St. Paul, MN. (CLK) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 19-cv-3033 JRT/KMM. (CLK) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Paul Davis Restoration of Greater St. Paul, MN (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7318320) filed by Mitchell Thomas Kobs. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kitzer, Phillip) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.