This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/02/2019 at 11:32:55 (UTC).

Kobiela v. Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2019 Kobiela filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jorge L. Alonso. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03006

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jorge L. Alonso

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dianna Kobiela

Defendant

Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John William Billhorn

Attorney at Billhorn Law Firm

53 West Jackson Blvd., Suite 840

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorneys

Michael H. Cramer

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

155 N. Wacker Drive, Suite 4300

Chicago, IL 60606

Michael D. Ray

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

201 S. College Street, Suite 2300

Charlotte, NC 28244

Michael Vincent Furlong

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

155 North Wacker Drive, Suite 4500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Motion by Michael Vincent Furlong for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #10 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/9/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION by Defendant Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. for extension of time to file answer - DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD AND TO RESCHEDULE THE INITIAL STATUS HEARING - (Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Initial status hearing set for 7/17/19 at 9:30 a.m. Parties shall review and comply with Judge Alonso's Standing Order on The Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project on his website. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. by Michael Vincent Furlong (Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. by Michael D. Ray (Ray, Michael) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. by Michael H. Cramer (Cramer, Michael) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

5 #1

Notice of Filing

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dianna Kobiela. Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. waiver sent on 5/6/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Billhorn, John) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, ) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dianna Kobiela by John William Billhorn (Billhorn, John) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Billhorn, John) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

1 #1

Dianna Kobiela Consent To Sue

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Dianna Kobiela, on behalf of herself, and all other plaintiffs similarly situated, known and unknown v. Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. filed by Dianna Kobiela; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15789023. (Attachments: #1 Dianna Kobiela Consent To Sue)(Billhorn, John) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Motion by Michael Vincent Furlong for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #10 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/9/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION by Defendant Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. for extension of time to file answer - DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD AND TO RESCHEDULE THE INITIAL STATUS HEARING - (Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Initial status hearing set for 7/17/19 at 9:30 a.m. Parties shall review and comply with Judge Alonso's Standing Order on The Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project on his website. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. by Michael Vincent Furlong (Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. by Michael D. Ray (Ray, Michael) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. by Michael H. Cramer (Cramer, Michael) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dianna Kobiela. Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. waiver sent on 5/6/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Billhorn, John) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, ) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dianna Kobiela by John William Billhorn (Billhorn, John) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Billhorn, John) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Dianna Kobiela, on behalf of herself, and all other plaintiffs similarly situated, known and unknown v. Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. filed by Dianna Kobiela; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15789023. (Attachments: #1 Dianna Kobiela Consent To Sue)(Billhorn, John) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JONES LANG LASALLE AMERICAS, INC., A MARYLAND CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John William Billhorn