This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/08/2020 at 16:05:12 (UTC).

Kobasic v. Delta, County of et al

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 Kobasic filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Delta, County of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert J. Jonker and Maarten Vermaat. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00113

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Jonker

Referral Judge

Maarten Vermaat

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kurtis Kobasic

Defendants

Lauren Wickman

Delta County

Delta, County of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Celeste Dunn

Attorney at Celeste M. Dunn, PLC

P.O. Box 230

Clarkston, MI 48347

Defendant Attorney

Gregory R. Grant

Attorney at Cummings, McClorey, Davis & Acho, PLC

310 W Front St., Ste. 221

Traverse City, MI 49684

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction ; Brief in Support - Oral Argument Requested #9 filed by Delta, County of, Lauren Wickman (Grant, Gregory) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction ; Brief in Support - Oral Argument Requested #9 filed by Delta, County of, Lauren Wickman (Grant, Gregory) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction ; Brief in Support - Oral Argument Requested by defendants Delta, County of, Lauren Wickman; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Trial Court & Appellate Orders, #2 Exhibit B - Motion to Intervene & Order Denying same, #3 Exhibit C - (Part I) - Show Cause Hearing Transcript dated 7/28/17, #4 Exhibit C - (Part II) - Show Cause Hearing Transcript dated 7/28/17) (Grant, Gregory) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Gregory R. Grant on behalf of defendants Delta, County of, Lauren Wickman (Grant, Gregory) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS returned executed; Delta, County of served on 7/15/2020, answer due 8/5/2020 (Dunn, Celeste) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS returned executed; Lauren Wickman served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020 (Dunn, Celeste) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) (DISREGARD) SUMMONS returned executed; Lauren Wickman served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020 (Dunn, Celeste) Modified text on 8/14/2020 - duplicate of document #7 (slk). (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First AMENDED COMPLAINT and Exhibits against All Defendants filed by Kurtis Kobasic (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B) (Dunn, Celeste) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Delta, County of, Lauren Wickman (mlc) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (mlc) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • Docket(DISREGARD) RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00 by attorney Celeste Dunn on behalf of plaintiff, receipt number AMIWDC-5449681; for filing fee (mkc) Modified text on 7/13/2020; duplicate entry (mkc). (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00 by attorney Celeste Dunn on behalf of plaintiff, receipt number AMIWDC-5449681; for filing fee (mkc) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Attachments: #1 Summons Wickman, #2 Summons Delta) (Dunn, Celeste) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Kurtis Kobasic (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B) (Dunn, Celeste) Modified text on 7/13/2020 (mlc). (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory R. Grant