Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/20/2019 at 07:23:55 (UTC).

Knutsen et al v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 06/21/2019 Knutsen filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Vermont District. The Judges overseeing this case are John M. Conroy and William K. Sessions III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00107

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Vermont District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

John M. Conroy

William K. Sessions III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The Estate of Rowan Knutsen

Corey Knutsen

Meghan Ferguson

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael F. Hanley, Esq.

Attorney at Plante & Hanley, P.C.

82 Fogg Farm Road, P.O. Box 708

White River Junction, VT 05001-0708

Paul J. Perkins, Esq.

Attorney at Plante & Hanley, P.C.

82 Fogg Farm Road, P.O. Box 708

White River Junction, VT 05001-0708

Defendant Attorney

Jason M. Turner, AUSA

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

P.O. Box 570

Burlington, VT 05402-0570

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Certificate of Service

#6

(#6) OBJECTION to Direct Assignment by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(law) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

5 #2

Exhibit 2

5 #1

Exhibit 1

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #4 Affidavit of Service filed by Corey Knutsen, The Estate of Rowan Knutsen, Meghan Ferguson. The main document was uploaded with its attachments as a singular pdf. The document has been broken apart and reattached to the entry. The corrected documents are now attached to #4 as well as this entry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (jlh) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

4 #2

Exhibit 2

4 #1

Exhibit 1

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Corey Knutsen, The Estate of Rowan Knutsen, Meghan Ferguson. United States of America served on 6/27/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Perkins, Paul) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/10/2019) (jlh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2019: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (jlh). (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Case Reassignment pursuant to Local Rule 73(d). Case reassigned to Judge William K. Sessions III. Judge John M. Conroy no longer assigned to the case. (law) (Entered: 06/29/2019)

#2

(#2) OBJECTION to Direct Assignment by Meghan Ferguson, Corey Knutsen, The Estate of Rowan Knutsen (Perkins, Paul) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Certificate of Merit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against United States of America filed by Corey Knutsen, The Estate of Rowan Knutsen, Meghan Ferguson. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Merit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(law) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) OBJECTION to Direct Assignment by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(law) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #4 Affidavit of Service filed by Corey Knutsen, The Estate of Rowan Knutsen, Meghan Ferguson. The main document was uploaded with its attachments as a singular pdf. The document has been broken apart and reattached to the entry. The corrected documents are now attached to #4 as well as this entry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (jlh) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Corey Knutsen, The Estate of Rowan Knutsen, Meghan Ferguson. United States of America served on 6/27/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Perkins, Paul) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/10/2019) (jlh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2019: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (jlh). (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Case Reassignment pursuant to Local Rule 73(d). Case reassigned to Judge William K. Sessions III. Judge John M. Conroy no longer assigned to the case. (law) (Entered: 06/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) OBJECTION to Direct Assignment by Meghan Ferguson, Corey Knutsen, The Estate of Rowan Knutsen (Perkins, Paul) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • ISSUED Summons as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.(law) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against United States of America filed by Corey Knutsen, The Estate of Rowan Knutsen, Meghan Ferguson. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Merit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(law) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less