This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/05/2022 at 08:08:21 (UTC).

Knudsen v. Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/04/2022 Knudsen filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Charles Schwab Co , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul G. Byron and Embry J. Kidd. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00242

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Byron

Referral Judge

Embry J. Kidd

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carolyn Knudsen

Defendant

Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Noah E. Storch

Attorney at Richard Celler Legal, P.A.

10368 W. Sr 84, Suite 103

Davie, FL 33324

Defendant Attorneys

Gretchen M. Lehman

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Tampa

100 N Tampa St Ste 3600

Tampa, FL 33602-5867

Stephanie Generotti

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Tampa

100 N Tampa St Ste 3600

Tampa, FL 33602-5867

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19198959) filed by Carolyn Knudsen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Storch, Noah) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. (BD) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 2/7/2022. (PML) ctp (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#5

(#5) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/7/2022. (GNB) ctp (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#6

(#6) RETURN of service executed on 2/14/22 by Carolyn Knudsen as to Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.. (Storch, Noah) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#7

(#7) (DISCHARGED BY #14 ENDORSED ORDER) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Carolyn Knudsen. Plaintiff has failed to comply with the Court's Order #5. Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE and file a response to said Order within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/28/2022. (GNB) ctp Modified on 3/15/2022 (RDO). (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Carolyn Knudsen. Related case(s): No (Storch, Noah) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Initial Case Order by Carolyn Knudsen. (Storch, Noah) Modified on 2/28/2022 (RDO). (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#10

(#10) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc..(Lehman, Gretchen) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Generotti on behalf of Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. (Generotti, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Order by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Charles Schwab Corporation, Other Affiliate The Toronto-Dominion Bank for Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.. (Lehman, Gretchen) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #7 Order to show cause filed by Carolyn Knudsen. (Storch, Noah) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ENDORSED ORDER discharging #7 Order to show cause. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/15/2022. (GNB) ctp (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #7 Order to show cause filed by Carolyn Knudsen. (Storch, Noah) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Order by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Charles Schwab Corporation, Other Affiliate The Toronto-Dominion Bank for Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.. (Lehman, Gretchen) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Generotti on behalf of Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. (Generotti, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc..(Lehman, Gretchen) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Initial Case Order by Carolyn Knudsen. (Storch, Noah) Modified on 2/28/2022 (RDO). (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Carolyn Knudsen. Related case(s): No (Storch, Noah) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) (DISCHARGED BY #14 ENDORSED ORDER) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Carolyn Knudsen. Plaintiff has failed to comply with the Court's Order #5. Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE and file a response to said Order within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/28/2022. (GNB) ctp Modified on 3/15/2022 (RDO). (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of service executed on 2/14/22 by Carolyn Knudsen as to Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.. (Storch, Noah) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/7/2022. (GNB) ctp (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 2/7/2022. (PML) ctp (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. (BD) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:22-cv-0242-PGB-EJK. (SJB) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19198959) filed by Carolyn Knudsen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Storch, Noah) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gretchen Maria Lehman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie Generotti