This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/29/2020 at 14:14:42 (UTC).

Knox v. Lowe's Home Centers LLC

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 Knox filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Lowe's Home Centers LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alan D Albright and Jeffrey C. Manske. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00158

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

Referral Judge

Jeffrey C. Manske

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Knox

Defendant

Lowe's Home Centers LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joel S. Shields

Attorney at Scanes & Routh, LLP

7901 Fish Pond Road, Suite 200, P.O. Box 20965

Waco, TX 76702

Benjamin C. Yelverton

Attorney at Scanes & Routh, LLP

P. O. Box 20965

Waco, TX 76710

Defendant Attorneys

Laura Bradarich Williams

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar LLP

115 Grand Avenue, Suite 222

Southlake, TX 76092

Andrea Whalen Paris

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar LLP

115 Grand Avenue, Suite 222

Southlake, TX 76092

Claudine G. Jackson

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar LLP

201 Main Street, Suite 1100

Fort Worth, TX 76102

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by James Knox. (Yelverton, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#8

(#8) CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (Jackson, Claudine) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 4/22/2021 10:30 AM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske, Jury Selection set for 5/3/2021 09:00AM before Judge Alan D Albright, Jury Trial set for 5/3/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright, Amended Pleadings due by 10/23/2020, Joinder of Parties due by 10/23/2020. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (mc5) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER CANCELLING DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (mc5) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Claudine) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. (tada) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

#3

(#3) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PURSUANT TO RULES 16(b) AND 26(f), Telephone Conference set for 4/8/2020 02:15 PM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (am) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#2

(#2) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Lowe's Home Centers LLC.(Jackson, Claudine) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

1 #12

Supplement

1 #11

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by James Knox. (Yelverton, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (Jackson, Claudine) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 4/22/2021 10:30 AM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske, Jury Selection set for 5/3/2021 09:00AM before Judge Alan D Albright, Jury Trial set for 5/3/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright, Amended Pleadings due by 10/23/2020, Joinder of Parties due by 10/23/2020. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (mc5) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER CANCELLING DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (mc5) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Claudine) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. (tada) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PURSUANT TO RULES 16(b) AND 26(f), Telephone Conference set for 4/8/2020 02:15 PM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (am) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Lowe's Home Centers LLC.(Jackson, Claudine) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE (lad) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lowe's Home Centers LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13275629), filed by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Supplement)(Jackson, Claudine) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lowe's Home Centers, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin C. Yelverton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joel S. Shields