This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/26/2022 at 08:09:52 (UTC).

Knox v. LMC Trucking Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2022 Knox filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LMC Trucking Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lorna G. Schofield. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03423

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lorna G. Schofield

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lonnie Knox

Defendants

LMC Trucking Corp.

Jorge A PANCHAME

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Michael V. Campanile

Other Attorneys

Jason Stuart Firestein

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Stuart Firestein on behalf of Lonnie Knox..(Firestein, Jason) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Exhibit Summons & Complaint

2 #2

Exhibit Answer

#3

(#3) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Campanile, Michael) Modified on 4/28/2022 (vf). (Entered: 04/28/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Exhibit Summons & Complaint

4 #2

Exhibit Answer

#5

(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Campanile, Michael) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER: ORDERED that the matter is remanded to state court. Pursuant to section 1447(c), the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a certified copy of this Order to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, Bronx County. The Clerk of Court is further directed to close the case. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/2/2022) (mml) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 05/02/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketCASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Bronx. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1Z E22 E53 37 1005 641 2 on 5/3/2022. (mml) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: ORDERED that the matter is remanded to state court. Pursuant to section 1447(c), the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a certified copy of this Order to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, Bronx County. The Clerk of Court is further directed to close the case. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/2/2022) (mml) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Campanile, Michael) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of Bronx. Case Number: 800786/2022e..Document filed by Jorge A Panchame, LMC Trucking Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer).(Campanile, Michael) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so redesignated. (aea) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge Cathy Seibel is no longer assigned to the case. (aea) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael V. Campanile. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code Foley Square; Dollar Demand Blank; County code Bronx; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to White Plains; the Dollar Demand has been modified to 5,250,000; the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Michael V. Campanile to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (vf) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michael V. Campanile to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): not all the filer/filers were selected for the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #2 Notice of Removal. Filing fee $ 402.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-26065505, paid on 4/27/2022. (vf) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Campanile, Michael) Modified on 4/28/2022 (vf). (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of Bronx. Case Number: 800786/2022e..Document filed by LMC Trucking Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer).(Campanile, Michael) Modified on 4/28/2022 (vf). (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Stuart Firestein on behalf of Lonnie Knox..(Firestein, Jason) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Michael V. Campanile. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michael V. Campanile to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 5/3/2022. (vf) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less