This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/29/2021 at 09:29:34 (UTC).

Knox v. Hanber et al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 Knox filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Hanber. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Suzanne Mitchell and Joe Heaton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00424

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Suzanne Mitchell

Presiding Judge

Joe Heaton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Antone Lamandingo Knox

Long Beach, CA 90801-0226

Alishaka I Mandingozulu-El

Long Beach, CA 90801-0226

Defendants

FNU Hanber

Svenja Cooper

Carla King

Mark Bowen

Mark Knutson

K Rhodes

Scott Crow

Haber

Alicia Katzinger-Ross

 

Court Documents

#4

#5

#6

#7

#9

#11

#14

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 plaintiff's motion for extension of deadline...plaintiff may file his objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation #7 not later than 07/24/2021. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 06/24/2021. (lam) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Extension of Time by Antone Lamandingo Knox. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjs) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Order titled, "Emergency Docket" by Antone Lamandingo Knox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Publication, #2 Exhibit 2 - Minute Order Summary, #3 Envelope)(jjs) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER directing plaintiff to file his objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation #7 within 21 days from the date of this order. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 06/11/2021. (lam) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Change of Address by Antone Lamandingo Knox (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjs) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #5 Order Reassigning Case, #1 Complaint, #6 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, as to Antone Lamandingo Knox (jjs) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Antone Lamandingo Knox, as to Antone Lamandingo Knox (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jjs) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Antone Lamandingo Knox. The undersigned recommends the denial of Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, and the dismissal without prejudice of this conditionally filed action unless Plaintiff pays the full filing fee within twenty-one days from the date of any order adopting this Report and Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 5/28/2021. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues referred to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 5/7/21. (lb) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address form, #1 Complaint, #5 Enter order, #6 Enter Order to Antone Lamandingo Knox #191626 LAWTON-LCF 8607 SE Flower Mound Rd Lawton, OK 73501 to (kmt) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. Signed by the direction of Honorable Joe Heaton on 5/3/2021. (kmt) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Joe Heaton for all further proceedings. Honorable Charles Goodwin no longer assigned to case. Signed by the direction of Honorable Charles Goodwin on 5/3/2021. (kmt) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PREVIOUS Cases (kmt) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Antone Lamandingo Knox. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Pro Se ENTRY of Appearance titled, "Under Imminent Danger of Physical Injury Ex Parte-Entry of Appearance Pro-Se, Pursuant to Local Court Rule" by Antone Lamandingo Knox (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Mark Bowen(Individually), Mark Bowen(In official capacity, Warden at LCF), Svenja Cooper(In official capacity, Lt./GC), Svenja Cooper(Individually), Scott Crow(In official capacity, Dir. of ODOC), Scott Crow(Individually), FNU Hanber, FNU Hanber, Alicia Katzinger-Ross(In official capacity, Law Library Supvr./CO), Alicia Katzinger-Ross(Individually), Carla King(In official capacity, ODOC Prea-Agency Coordinator ), Carla King(Individually), Mark Knutson(Individually), Mark Knutson(In official capacity, DIR Designee), K Rhodes(In official capacity, CO of Lawt. Library), K Rhodes(Individually) filed by Antone Lamandingo Knox. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HABER CORPORATION CERTIFIED PUBLIC AC is a litigant